Cravens et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80382 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Connecticut, 3:19-cv-01683 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 01, 2020 7:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
JARQUISHA HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
george cravens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fernando Zaragoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VENUS SYKES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SCOTT MOSER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RONALD MARANTO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KILEEN GROMELSKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL DELUCCIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAUL BURPULIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DONALD BOLAND
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks
Fri 10/13 9:22 AM
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction re40 MDL 2924 Final Judgment. Document Filed in Wrong Case ; Document restricted and docket text modified. The parties are directed to disregard the final judgment at docket entry40 (mr1) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Wed 09/27 8:58 AM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
38 | 38
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Wed 06/22 5:26 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Fernando Zaragoza.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Monday, June 20, 2022 | ||
36 | 36
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Mon 06/20 2:13 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT for Micahel DeLuccia against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Glaxo Holdings Ltd., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C., Patheon Manufacturing Serivces, LLC, Inc Pfizer, Pfizer Inc, filed by MICHAEL DELUCCIA.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Tue 06/21 11:08 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re36 Amended Complaint. Parties Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (ebz) |
||
Wednesday, April 13, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Wed 04/13 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by george cravens (Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Thu 04/07 5:55 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MICHAEL DELUCCIA.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Tue 04/05 11:31 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Fernando Zaragoza.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
10
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 09/17 5:18 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C., Inc Pfizer, Pfizer Inc, SANOFI S.A, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Glaxo Wellcome INc., Glaxo Holdings Ltd., filed by Fernando Zaragoza.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Monday, August 23, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 08/23 6:00 PM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT (DISMISSALS INCLUDED AS TO SANOFI) against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C., Patheon Manufacturing Serivces, LLC, Inc Pfizer, Pfizer Inc, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc, filed by Fernando Zaragoza.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
9
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Tue 11/10 10:09 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MICHAEL DELUCCIA.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Mon 11/09 2:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Fernando Zaragoza.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Third Party Complaint
Fri 11/06 12:51 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by george cravens.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Fri 10/30 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re26 MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, of Ronald Maranto for Failure to Comply with PTOs 15, 23, and 38 filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Chattem Inc., Pfizer Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. . Attorney Mark S. Cheffo added to party GlaxoSmithKline LLC(pty:dft). (Cheffo, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss
Wed 10/28 10:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, of Ronald Maranto for Failure to Comply with PTOs 15, 23, and 38 by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Responses due by 11/12/2020 (Cheffo, Mark) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
order
Administrative Order
Fri 03/06 3:38 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 03/05 10:25 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
23 | 23
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Thu 03/05 10:21 AM
Case transferred in from Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-01683. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
22 | 22 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to Southern District of Florida. (signed by Clerk Karen K. Caldwell, MDL Panel on 02/06/2020)(Murphy, Tatihana) | |
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER granting20 Motion to Stay. The action is stayed pending the decision of the JPML in In Re: Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litig., MDL No. 2924. All deadlines are vacated until further order of the Court. The parties shall notify the Court of the JPML's decision within ten (10) days of the decision. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/5/2019. (Rickevicius, L.) | |
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
20 | 20 Joint MOTION to Stay and Stipulation to Stay all proceedings pending JPML Determination by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.Responses due by 12/18/2019 (Mancari, Leeanne) | |
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
19 | 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chattem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Chattem, Inc.. (Mancari, Leeanne) | |
18 | 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Mancari, Leeanne) | |
17 | 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Mancari, Leeanne) | |
16 | 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Leeanne Sara Mancari on behalf of Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Mancari, Leeanne) | |
15 | 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah A. Westby on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Westby, Sarah) | |
14 | 14 ORDER granting13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 12/19/2019 to answer, move or otherwise respond to plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/18/2019. (Rickevicius, L.) | |
Answer deadline updated for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to 12/19/2019; Chattem, Inc. to 12/19/2019; Glaxosmithkline LLC to 12/19/2019; Glaxosmithkline plc to 12/19/2019; Pfizer, Inc. to 12/19/2019; Sanofi US Services Inc. to 12/19/2019; Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC to 12/19/2019. (Rickevicius, L.) | ||
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 19, 2019 respond to Complaint1 Complaint, by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fahey, Patrick) | |
12 | 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fahey, Patrick) | |
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Fahey on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Fahey, Patrick) | |
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Moser, Donald Boland, George Cravens, Ronald Maranto, Venus Sykes, Michael DeLuccia, Paul Burpulis, Kileen Gromelski, Fernando Zaragoza, Jarquisha Harris. All Defendants. (Barrett, Christopher) | |
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Barrett on behalf of Donald Boland, Paul Burpulis, George Cravens, Michael DeLuccia, Kileen Gromelski, Jarquisha Harris, Ronald Maranto, Scott Moser, Venus Sykes, Fernando Zaragoza (Barrett, Christopher) | |
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig A. Raabe* *Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP* *29 South Main Street, Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Murphy, Tatihana) | |
7 | 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Glaxosmithkline LLC, Glaxosmithkline plc* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Craig A. Raabe* * Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP* *29 South Main Street, Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Murphy, Tatihana) | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig A. Raabe* *Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP* *29 South Main Street, Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Murphy, Tatihana) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Complaint, filed by Kileen Gromelski, Scott Moser, George Cravens, Jarquisha Harris, Michael DeLuccia, Fernando Zaragoza, Donald Boland, Venus Sykes, Paul Burpulis, Ronald Maranto,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,3 Electronic Filing Order,4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) | |
4 | 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) | |
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) | |
2 | 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/24/2019. Discovery due by 4/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5501842.), filed by Scott Moser, Donald Boland, George Cravens, Ronald Maranto, Venus Sykes, Michael DeLuccia, Paul Burpulis, Kileen Gromelski, Fernando Zaragoza, Jarquisha Harris.(Raabe, Craig) Modified text to correct parties on 10/28/2019 (Anastasio, F.). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Raabe, Craig) | ||
Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.) |