Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-34105

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barbara J Houser
Case #: 3:20-ap-03024
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2020
Terminated:Dec 23, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
HULU, LLC
Represented By
HULU, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James W. Cunningham, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Michael Wayne Sebesta
Cavazos Hendricks Poirot, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
court Close adversary case Wed 12/23 1:35 PM
Adversary case 3:20-ap-3024 closed (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
26 26 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 12/10 11:24 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/10/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Agreed Order dismissing case with prejudice (related document # []). Entered on 12/8/2020 (Bradden, T.)
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
25 25 order Dismiss adversary case Tue 12/08 1:32 PM
Agreed Order dismissing case with prejudice Related [+]. Entered on 12/8/2020 (Bradden, T.)
Related: [-] []
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
24 24 court Hearing set/continued Tue 11/17 3:00 PM
Hearing reset from 1:15PM to 10:30AM Related [+] Trial Docket Call date set for 12/1/2020 at 10:30 AM at Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. (Harden, D.) Modified TEXT on 11/17/2020 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-03024 Complaint by James W. Cunningham, Chapter 7 Trustee against HULU, LLC d/b/a HULU. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A). Nature(s) of suit: 12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
23 23 order Amend scheduling order Tue 08/04 3:12 PM
Order granting motion to amend scheduling order Related [+] Trial Docket Call date set for 12/1/2020 at 01:15 PM at Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. Entered on 8/4/2020. (Bradden, T.)
Related: [-] 22
Friday, July 31, 2020
22 22 motion Amend scheduling order Fri 07/31 11:30 AM
Motion to amend scheduling order. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-] 3 Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 23, 2020
21 21 answer Answer to complaint Thu 07/23 3:53 PM
Answer to complaint filed by HULU, LLC. (Held, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
20 20 cmp Summons service executed Tue 06/02 5:03 PM
Summons service executed on HULU, LLC 6/2/2020 (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 court Summons issued Tue 06/02 3:47 PM
Summons reissued on HULU, LLC aka HULU LLC dba HULU Answer Due 7/2/2020 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
18 18 court Summons issued Mon 06/01 1:46 PM
Summons reissued on HULU, LLC dba Hulu aka HULU LLC Answer Due 7/1/2020 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 31, 2020
17 17 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sun 05/31 11:24 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/31/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order granting motion for leave to file first amended complaint (related document14 ) Entered on 5/29/2020. (Bradden, T.)
Friday, May 29, 2020
16 16 cmp Amended complaint Fri 05/29 1:46 PM
Amended complaint by Michael Wayne Sebesta on behalf of James W. Cunningham against HULU, LLC No change to nature of suit. Related [+]. (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-03024 Complaint by James W. Cunningham, Chapter 7 Trustee against HULU, LLC d/b/a HULU. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A). Nature(s) of suit: 12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham
Att: 1 Exhibit A
15 15 order Leave (Not for Appeal use) Fri 05/29 10:21 AM
Order granting motion for leave to file first amended complaint Related [+] Entered on 5/29/2020. (Bradden, T.)
Related: [-] 14
Friday, May 22, 2020
14 14 motion Leave (Not for Appeal use) Fri 05/22 10:37 AM
Motion for leave for Trustee to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, May 18, 2020
13 13 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Mon 05/18 3:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael Burns filed by Defendant HULU, LLC, d/b/a HULU (Burns, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
12 12 misc Certificate of service Fri 05/15 3:14 PM
Certificate of service re: Notice of Withdrawal of the Trustees Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment Against Defendant, Hulu, LLC d/b/a hulu filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham Related [+]. (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-] 11 Withdrawal
11 11 misc Withdrawal Fri 05/15 3:13 PM
Withdrawal of Trustees Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment Against Defendant, Hulu, LLC d/b/a hulu filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham Related [+]. (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for default judgment against Defendant, HULU, LLC d/b/a Hulu
Thursday, April 30, 2020
10 10 notice Notice (generic) Thu 04/30 4:01 PM
COURT'S NOTICE/ VIDEO CONFERENCE INFORMATION FOR HEARING ON 5/20/2020 AT 9:30AM Related [+]. (Harden, D.)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for default judgment against Defendant, HULU, LLC d/b/a Hulu filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Monday, April 20, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of service Mon 04/20 11:16 AM
Certificate of service re: Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment Against Defendant, HULU, LLC d/b/a Hulu and Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham Related [+]. (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for default judgment against Defendant, HULU, LLC d/b/a Hulu ,8 Notice of hearing
8 8 notice Notice of hearing Mon 04/20 11:11 AM
Notice of hearing for Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment Against Defendant, HULU, LLC d/b/a Hulu filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 5/20/2020 at 09:30 AM Dallas Judge Houser Ctrm for7 , (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham
7 7 motion Default judgment Mon 04/20 11:07 AM
Motion for default judgment against Defendant, HULU, LLC d/b/a Hulu filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 17, 2020
6 6 court Clerk's entry of default Fri 04/17 9:53 AM
Clerk's entry of default as to Defendant HULU, LLC d/b/a Hulu Related [+] (Harden, D.)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for clerk's entry of default against HULU, LLC d/b/a Hulu filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael W. Sebesta In Support # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham
Thursday, April 16, 2020
5 5 motion Clerk's entry of default Thu 04/16 2:40 PM
Motion for clerk's entry of default against HULU, LLC d/b/a Hulu filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael W. Sebesta In Support
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, March 06, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Fri 03/06 2:09 PM
Summons service executed on HULU, LLC 3/6/2020 (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Fri 03/06 10:44 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 9/1/2020 at 01:15 PM at Dallas Judge Houser Ctrm. Entered on 3/6/2020 (Jeng, Hawaii)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham
2 2 court Summons issued Fri 03/06 9:37 AM
Summons issued on HULU, LLC Answer Due 4/6/2020 (Jeng, Hawaii)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/05 11:24 AM
Adversary case 20-03024 Complaint by James W. Cunningham, Chapter 7 Trustee against HULU, LLC d/b/a HULU. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 Related [+]. 14. (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit A