California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:20-cv-02250
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1338 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2020
Terminated:Sep 24, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Sep 05, 2020 4:51 AM PDT
Defendant
Interlude US, Inc.
Represented By
Hong-An Vu
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Cindy Chang
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Elizabeth J Low
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Indra Neel Chatterjee
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Christie L. Larochelle
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Darryl M Woo
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Defendant
JBF Interlude 2009 Ltd - Israel
Represented By
Hong-An Vu
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Cindy Chang
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Indra Neel Chatterjee
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Christie L. Larochelle
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Darryl M Woo
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Quibi Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Ryan James Malloy
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Richard Judson Stark
Cravath Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Michael A Jacobs
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Thomas Julian Pardini
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
David R Marriott
Cravath Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Benjamin J Fox
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Soo Jeong Park
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, September 24, 2021
392 392 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Fri 09/24 10:50 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
391 391 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 09/24 10:37 AM
ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL UNDER RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE390 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the consolidated actions, Quibi Holdings, LLC v. Interlude U.S., Inc. d/b/a Eko, et al., Case No. 2:20-cv-02250-CAS(SKx), and JBF Interlude 2009 Ltd, et al. v. Quibi Holdings, LLC, et al., Case No. 2:20-cv-02299-CAS(SKx), Case No. 2:20-cv-02299-CAS(SKx), are dismissed with prejudice in their entirety, including all parties, claims, and counterclaims, each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees; 2. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, eko's counsel are relieved from the "prosecution bar" provisions the Protective Order entered in these consolidated actions (2250 Dkt. No. 57, as amended in 2250 Dkt. No. 337, 2299 Dkt. No. 499). All other provisions of the Protective Order will remain in place(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
390 390 stip Dismiss Case Fri 09/17 4:16 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Plaintiff/Defendants Quibi Holdings, LLC, WNDRCO HOLDINGS LLC.(Jacobs, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order