Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kathy A Surratt-States
Case #: 4:20-bk-41308
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Jun 24, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Foresight Energy LP
Metropolitan Square Building 211 North Broadway Suite 2600
St. Louis, MO 63102
Represented By
Richard W. Engel, Jr.
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102


1. Foresight Energy Is Latest U.S. Coal Miner in Bankruptcy (finance.yahoo.com)
Submitted Tue 03/10/2020
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1134 1134 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/24 6:41 PM
Certificate of Service of Sonia Akter Regarding Chapter 11 Post Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ended March 31, 2025 Filed by Other Professional Kroll Restructuring Administration, LLC Related [+]. (Pagan, Chanel)
Related: [-] 1133 Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report