Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:20-cv-01763
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2020
Case in other court:USDC, District of Nebraska (8 Omaha), 8:20-cv-00074-JFB-CRZ
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 08, 2020 2:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Michael K. Huffer
Cassem, Tierney Law Firm
contact info
Ronald F. Krause
Cassem, Tierney Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
James Pearson
Represented By
David A. Domina
Domina Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Maureen Pearson
Represented By
David A. Domina
Domina Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Thursday, March 12, 2020
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 03/13 12:11 PM
Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the District of Nebraska (8 Omaha); Case Number 8:20-cv-00074-JFB-CRZ. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Fri 03/13 12:20 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED re 16-md-2741-VC: USDC, District of Nebraska (8 Omaha), 8:20-cv-00074-JFB-CRZ, Maureen Pearson, et al v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-01763-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-192) cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
8 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Northern District of California, Docket No. 2741.(TCL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter
Case transferred to USDC-Northern District of California. Original electronic file sent. (TCL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
7 7 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Northern District of California, Docket No. 2741. (TCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
6 6 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Monsanto Company (Huffer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
5 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Monsanto Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
Related: [-]
4 4 LETTER by Clerk regarding Notice of Removal1 , with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LRM)
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Request for Location of Trial by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendant Monsanto Company (Huffer, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Defendant Monsanto Company from District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-208, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number ANEDC-4119009) with Attached State Court Pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Monsanto Company(Huffer, Michael)
Related: [-]