Martin v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80452 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Southern, 2:20-cv-00115 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 16, 2020 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services, Inc.
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301 |
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Lyndon Martin
503 Earl Avenue
Demopolis, AL 36732 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
order
Administrative Order ~Util - Terminate Case Associations
Fri 09/16 3:29 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES. This case is DECONSOLIDATED from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. Case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Mon 06/27 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Lyndon Martin (Dellaccio, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, November 02, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 11/02 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon C. Conlin on behalf of Lyndon Martin. Attorney Jon C. Conlin added to party Lyndon Martin(pty:pla). (Conlin, Jon) |
|
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 10/27 11:40 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lyndon Martin. Responses due by 11/10/2021 (Dellaccio, Douglas) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 10/27 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr on behalf of Lyndon Martin. Attorney Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr added to party Lyndon Martin(pty:pla). (Dellaccio, Douglas) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 10/27 11:55 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Lauren S. Miller representing Martin, Lyndon (Plaintiff) is withdrawn from this case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/27/2021. (sk01) |
||
Thursday, June 24, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Thu 06/24 6:25 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form (Version 2) against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi US Services, Inc., filed by Lyndon Martin.(Miller, Lauren) |
|
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Fri 06/25 12:09 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re11 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal. Parties/Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (ebz) |
||
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 08/21 9:05 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., filed by Lyndon Martin.(Miller, Lauren) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 08/21 12:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Inc Pfizer, Sanofi US Services, Inc., filed by Lyndon Martin.(Miller, Lauren) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Administrative Order
Mon 03/23 12:48 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Fri 03/20 11:58 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Alabama. Case Number 2:20-cv-00115 with documents 1-4. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80452-RLR on 3/20/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
6 | 6
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 03/20 11:55 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Fri 03/20 11:50 AM
Case transferred in from Alabama Southern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00115. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Southern District of Florida requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District consisting of Docs. 1 through 4. Case Closed. (eec) | |
Att: 1 Letter of Transmittal | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec) | |
2 | 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec) | |
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc. ( Receipt number AALSDC-2577983, Fee Paid at Intake), filed by Lyndon Martin. (Miller, Lauren) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Disclosure Statement, | ||
Att: 3 Summons - Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons - Sanofi US Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Summons - Pfizer, Inc., | ||
Att: 6 Summons - GlaxoSmithKline, LLC |