Cook v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80464 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 6:20-cv-00010 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 16, 2020 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
|
Interested Party
Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Cook
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Administrative Order
Mon 03/23 12:48 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Fri 03/20 4:47 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Texas. Case Number 6:20-cv-00010 with documents 1-11. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80464-RLR on 3/20/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
13 | 13
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 03/20 4:18 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
12 | 12
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Fri 03/20 4:16 PM
Case transferred in from Texas Southern; Case Number 6:20-cv-00010. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
11 | 11 JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) transferring case to Southern District of Florida to be included in MDL Docket No. 2924. (lgouadi, 4) | |
Interdistrict transfer to Southern District of Florida. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) | ||
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/6/2020.(Thoma, Oliver) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc identifying Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation and Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Thoma, Oliver) | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver Peter Thoma on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc, filed.(Thoma, Oliver) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Shannon Cook, filed.(Nicholas, Steven) | |
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020, filed.(Nicholas, Steven) | |
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER granting2 MOTION for Steven L Nicholas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) | |
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 6/3/2020 at 08:45 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(CarrieDickieadi, 6) | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc, GlaxoSmithKline LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(CarrieDickie, 6) | |
Att: 1 Summons Issued GSK, LLC | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Steven L Nicholas to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shannon Cook, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2020. (CarrieDickie, 6) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc, GlaxoSmithKline LLC filed by Shannon Cook. (Civil Filing Fee $400.00 Paid)(CarrieDickie, 6) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons - BIP, inc, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons - GSK, LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Letter | ||
Civil Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number VIC22556, filed. (BrittanyFoil, 6) |