Lane v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80474 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Rhode Island, 1:20-cv-00099 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 19, 2020 7:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Acting Commissioner Michael Lane
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
order
MDL Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/28 3:03 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES. The above-reference case is DECONSOLIDATED from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. The above-reference case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Thu 08/20 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITH[OUT] PREJUDICE by Michael Lane (Scott, Carmen) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 06/05 3:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Lane. All Plaintiffs. (Scott, Carmen) |
|
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Administrative Order
Fri 03/27 2:08 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Reissued
Fri 03/27 11:28 AM
Summons Reissued as to Pfizer, Inc. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Wed 03/25 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Pfizer, Inc. by Michael Lane (Scott, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/24 7:10 PM
NOTICE by Michael Lane of Withdrawal of Counsel Vincent Greene (Scott, Carmen) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Reissued
Tue 03/24 4:35 PM
Summons Reissued as to Pfizer, Inc. (mc) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Tue 03/24 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Pfizer Inc. by Michael Lane (Scott, Carmen) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 03/24 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carmen Sessions Scott on behalf of Michael Lane. Attorney Carmen Sessions Scott added to party Michael Lane(pty:pla). (Scott, Carmen) |
|
12 | 12
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Tue 03/24 8:44 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Rhode Island. Case Number 1:20-cv-00099 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80474-RLR on 3/23/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 03/23 3:24 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 03/23 3:22 PM
Case transferred in from Rhode Island; Case Number 1:20-cv-00099. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Mon 03/23 11:01 AM
Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-6): Transferring this matter to the Southern District of Florida for assignment to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in MDL No. 2924. So Ordered by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 3/20/2020. (Jackson, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Lane. Sanofi US Services Inc. served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (Greene, Vincent) | |
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Lane. Pfizer, Inc. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Greene, Vincent) | |
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Lane. Chattem. Inc. served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (Greene, Vincent) | |
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Lane. GlaxoSmithkline, LLC. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Greene, Vincent) | |
4 | 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Lane. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Greene, Vincent) | |
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem. Inc., GlaxoSmithkline, LLC., Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc.(Simoncelli, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
2 | 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1479625 ), filed by Michael Lane.(Greene, Vincent) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons | ||
Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael) |