Hochberger v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80479 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Northern, 1:20-cv-00797 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 20, 2020 6:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Breannon Hochberger
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
order
MDL Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/19 2:28 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES. The above-style case is DECONSOLIDATED from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. The above-reference case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Administrative Order
Fri 03/27 2:34 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 03/24 3:29 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Breannon Hochberger. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. (McGlamry, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Tue 03/24 3:28 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Georgia. Case Number 1:20-cv-00797 with documents 1-14. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80479-RLR on 3/24/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
16 | 16
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 03/24 9:16 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
15 | 15
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Tue 03/24 9:13 AM
Case transferred in from Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00797. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
14 | 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-6 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case to be transferred to Florida Southern for inclusion in MDL 2924. (aaq) | |
Civil Case Terminated. (aaq) | ||
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
13 | 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (ah) | |
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants may have through and including April 13, 2020 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/16/2020. (ah) | |
11 | 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Breannon Hochberger as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (McGlamry, Michael) | |
10 | 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re:1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Breannon Hochberger. (McGlamry, Michael) | |
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due 4/13/2020. (ah) | ||
Friday, March 13, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 Return of Service Executed by Breannon Hochberger. Chattem, Inc. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (McGlamry, Michael) | |
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 Return of Service Executed by Breannon Hochberger. (McGlamry, Michael) | |
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 Return of Service Executed by Breannon Hochberger. Sanofi US Services Inc. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (McGlamry, Michael) | |
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 Return of Service Executed by Breannon Hochberger. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (McGlamry, Michael) | |
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/21/2020. (ah) | |
4 | 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Chattem, Inc. (kt) | |
3 | 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc. (kt) | |
2 | 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (kt) | |
Notification of Docket Correction re1 Complaint. Edited to attach correct PDF to the entry. (kt) | ||
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Breannon Hochberger. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9397050)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (kt). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 (2/21/2020) Complaint |