Pike County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45131 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 31, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Eastern, 4:19-cv-03170 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 28, 2020 4:48 PM EDT |
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
John Kapoor
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan N.V.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
David Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Michael Babich
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 100 Inc
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 108, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 113, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 122, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 132, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 200, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 201, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 414, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 5, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 1000
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Pike County, Missouri
950 Francis Place, Suite 107
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Hospira Inc.
Terminated: 12/13/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2020 4:39 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.] | ||
7 | 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.] | |
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
![]() |
|
Monday, March 30, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
![]() |
|
24 | 24
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
![]() |