Hollingsworth v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80550 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:20-cv-00307 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 28, 2020 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmthKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Inc Pfizer
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Randall D Hollingsworth, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 21, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Terminate Case Associations
Wed 06/22 7:50 AM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES. This case is DECONSOLIDATED from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. Case remains closed. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Tue 06/14 10:01 AM
STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Randall D Hollingsworth, Jr (Woodson, Frank) |
|
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 06/14 12:10 PM
STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Randall D Hollingsworth, Jr. (ls)(See Image at DE #14 ) |
||
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Tue 06/14 12:11 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re14 Stipulation. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#15]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) |
||
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Tue 08/25 5:44 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmthKline LLC, Inc Pfizer, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., filed by Randall D Hollingsworth, Jr.(Woodson, Frank) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Administrative Order
Mon 04/27 2:46 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 04/01 10:32 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Alabama. Case Number 2:20-cv-00307 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80550-RLR on 4/1/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
10 | 10
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/01 10:25 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 04/01 10:21 AM
Case transferred in from Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00307. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL 2924: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Southern District of Florida for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk sent to Clerk of Court in Southern District of Florida. (MRR, ) | |
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020; Pfizer, Inc., served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. (MRR, ) | |
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Chattem, Inc. served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (MRR, ) | |
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed GlaxoSmthKline LLC served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020; Sanofi US Services Inc served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. (MRR, ) | |
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, sent via certified mail (MRR, ) | |
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT. (JLC) | |
2 | 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Randall D Hollingsworth, Jr. (JLC) | |
1 | 1 45 pgs COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmthKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc.,, Sanofi US Services Inc., filed by Randall D Hollingsworth, Jr.(JLC) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3551803, NDAL receipt #B4601104624. (Woodson, E) Modified on 3/6/2020 (JLC). |