Cartee v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80555 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Central, 4:20-cv-04059 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 28, 2020 4:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Cartee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name
Fri 10/29 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Edward A. Wallace (Wallace, Edward) |
|
notice
Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions
Fri 10/29 11:51 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Edward A. Wallace re22 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Edward A. Wallace has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing something in all pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions.[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information] (pt) |
||
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Thu 01/28 9:39 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re20 Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal filed in the Wrong Case . The document was re-docketed by the Filer in the correct case #20-md-02924-RLR, see DE 2665 . (apz) |
|
20 | 20
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 01/27 12:49 PM
Notice of Appeal by Arthur Cartee. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14292460. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Keller, Ashley) |
|
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Wed 01/27 12:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc., filed by Arthur Cartee.(Wallace, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
5
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Wed 12/09 11:36 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc., Walgreens, Walmart, filed by Arthur Cartee.(Wallace, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, December 08, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Tue 12/08 1:55 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re16 MDL Amended Complaint. Parties/Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (jao) |
|
16 | 16
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Tue 12/08 1:42 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Arthur Cartee.(Wallace, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Administrative Order
Mon 04/27 2:53 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 04/01 12:01 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Central District of Illinois. Case Number 4:20-cv-04059 with documents 1-11. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80555-RLR on 4/1/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
13 | 13
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/01 11:55 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
12 | 12
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 04/01 11:53 AM
Case transferred in from Illinois Central; Case Number 4:20-cv-04059. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
11 | 11 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL 2924) entered by Clerk, MDL Panel, transferring this case to the Southern District of Florida. This case is terminated. (KB, ilcd) | |
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
MDL Remark: TEXT ONLY ORDER - MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-9) Finalized on 3/31/2020. Please see pleading (4 in ALN/2:20-cv-00307, 3 in ALN/2:20-cv-00328, 4 in ALS/1:20-cv-00141, 4 in DC/1:20-cv-00646, 4 in FLM/6:20-cv-00377, 3 in ILC/4:20-cv-04059, 4 in KYE/6:20-cv-00053, 4 in KYW/3:20-cv-00161, 4 in KYW/4:20-cv-00038, 4 in KYW/5:20-cv-00046, 3 in LAW/6:20-cv-00320, 4 in MD/1:20-cv-00609, 4 in MD/1:20-cv-00611, 280 in MDL No. 2924, 4 in NJ/3:20-cv-02474, 4 in NJ/3:20-cv-02481, 4 in NJ/3:20-cv-02508, 3 in NJ/3:20-cv-02697, 3 in NJ/3:20-cv-02702, 4 in PAE/2:20-cv-01365, 4 in TNE/2:20-cv-00042, 4 in TNW/1:20-cv-02157, 4 in TXE/4:20-cv-00179, 4 in TXE/5:20-cv-00034, 4 in TXE/5:20-cv-00035, 4 in TXS/2:20-cv-00069, 3 in UT/2:20-cv-00155).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the S.D. Florida for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 3/31/2020.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2924 et al. (SM) (KB, ilcd) | ||
MDL Remark: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-9) - 26 action(s) re: pldg. (2 in ALN/2:20-cv-00307, 1 in ALN/2:20-cv-00328, 2 in ALS/1:20-cv-00141, 2 in DC/1:20-cv-00646, 2 in FLM/6:20-cv-00377, 1 in ILC/4:20-cv-04059, 2 in KYE/6:20-cv-00053, 2 in KYW/3:20-cv-00161, 2 in KYW/4:20-cv-00038, 2 in KYW/5:20-cv-00046, 1 in LAW/6:20-cv-00320, 2 in MD/1:20-cv-00609, 2 in MD/1:20-cv-00611, 260 in MDL No. 2924, 2 in NJ/3:20-cv-02474, 2 in NJ/3:20-cv-02481, 2 in NJ/3:20-cv-02508, 1 in NJ/3:20-cv-02697, 1 in NJ/3:20-cv-02702, 2 in PAE/2:20-cv-01365, 2 in TNE/2:20-cv-00042, 2 in TNW/1:20-cv-02157, 2 in TXE/4:20-cv-00179, 2 in TXE/5:20-cv-00034, 2 in TXE/5:20-cv-00035, 2 in TXS/2:20-cv-00069, 1 in UT/2:20-cv-00155) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 3/31/2020.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2924 et al. (SM) (KB, ilcd) | ||
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Arthur Cartee Plaintiff's Jurisdictional Addendum .(Wallace, Edward) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order | ||
Friday, March 13, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Edward A Wallace on behalf of Arthur Cartee (Wallace, Edward) | |
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01643. . | |
7 | 7 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois, the electronic record (ec, ) | |
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The complaint alleges that "[v]enue is proper because Plaintiff resides in Knox County, and it is the county in which Plaintiff purchased the subject medication and where he was injured." Doc. 1 at 2. However, Knox County is in the Central District of Illinois, not in this District. See 28 U.S.C. 93(b). Accordingly, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), this case is transferred to the Central District of Illinois. The Clerk shall effectuate the transfer forthwith. The status hearing set for 3/30/20204 is stricken. Civil case transferred.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) | |
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, ) | |
4 | 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing, by 3/23/2020, why this case should not be dismissed for want of subject matter jurisdiction. The complaint premises subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), but it does not properly allege the citizenship of Plaintiff or of Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Plaintiff may show cause by filing a Jurisdictional Addendum that properly alleges the citizenship of all parties. Failure to comply will result in the dismiss of this case for want of subject matter jurisdiction. Status hearing set for 3/30/2020 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) | |
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arthur Cartee by Timothy Jackson (Jackson, Timothy) | |
2 | 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arthur Cartee by Edward A. Wallace (Wallace, Edward) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed by Arthur Cartee; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16804295.(Wallace, Edward) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) |