MCCORD v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80563 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:20-cv-02697 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 28, 2020 6:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithkline, PLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Plaintiff
ALETHEA MCCORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brent McCord
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Tue 10/03 12:09 PM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 08/21 4:09 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants, filed by ALETHEA MCCORD, Brent McCord.(Boldt, Paige) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Administrative Order
Mon 04/27 3:02 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, April 15, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/15 7:11 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ALETHEA MCCORD. SANOFI AVENTIS U.S. LLC served on 3/24/2020, answer due 4/14/2020. (Watts, Mikal) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/15 7:09 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ALETHEA MCCORD. GlaxoSmithKline LLC served on 4/2/2020, answer due 4/23/2020. (Watts, Mikal) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/15 7:07 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ALETHEA MCCORD. Chattem Inc. served on 3/24/2020, answer due 4/14/2020. (Watts, Mikal) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/15 7:05 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ALETHEA MCCORD. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/24/2020, answer due 4/14/2020. (Watts, Mikal) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 04/01 3:07 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:20-cv-02697 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 3:20-cv-02697 on 4/1/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/01 1:37 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 04/01 1:35 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-02697. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
3 | 3
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Wed 04/01 9:59 AM
Order of MDL Panel (CTO-9) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, SANOFI AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, SANOFI AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10542416) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ALETHEA MCCORD.(BOLDT, PAIGE) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) |