MIKELL et al v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80565 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:20-cv-01365 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 28, 2020 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Inc Pfizer
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
TRIXIE ANN FULLENWINDER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KENNETH MIKELL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Thu 09/28 2:14 PM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Wednesday, July 27, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Wed 07/27 12:59 PM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TRIXIE ANN FULLENWINDER, KENNETH MIKELL.(Finken, Tracy) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 08/20 11:11 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TRIXIE ANN FULLENWINDER, KENNETH MIKELL. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Finken, Tracy) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/24 2:03 PM
Summons Issued as to CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (pes) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Thu 07/23 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by TRIXIE ANN FULLENWINDER, KENNETH MIKELL re8 Amended Complaint, filed by KENNETH MIKELL, TRIXIE ANN FULLENWINDER (Finken, Tracy) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 07/23 4:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Inc Pfizer, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., filed by KENNETH MIKELL, TRIXIE ANN FULLENWINDER.(Finken, Tracy) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 06/04 4:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KENNETH MIKELL, TRIXIE ANN FULLENWINDER. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020; Chattem Inc. waiver sent on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020; Glaxosmithkline LLC waiver sent on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020; Inc Pfizer waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; Sanofi U.S. Services Inc. waiver sent on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Finken, Tracy) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Administrative Order
Mon 04/27 3:08 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 04/01 3:23 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case Number 2:20-cv-01365 with documents 1-2. Assigned FLSD Case Number 2:20-cv-01365 on 4/1/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
4 | 4
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/01 1:59 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
3 | 3
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 04/01 1:56 PM
Case transferred in from Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01365. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. 3/31/20 ENTERED. (kw, ) | |
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, PFIZER, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE212774.), filed by KENNETH MIKELL, TRIXIE ANN FULLENWINDER.(bw, ) | |
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TRIXIE ANN FULLENWINDER, KENNETH MIKELL. (bw, ) | ||
5 Summons Issued as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, PFIZER, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 3/11/2020 (bw, ) |