Zielinski et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80569 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Western, 3:20-cv-00161 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 28, 2020 5:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nostrum Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ranbaxy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Precision Dose Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Research & Development Company
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Company, plc
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Company
|
|
Defendant
Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PAI Holdings, LLC, formerly known as Pharmaceutical Associates, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Novitium Pharma LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Laboratories Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Institutional LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Lannett Co., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
L. Perrigo Co.
|
|
Defendant
J B Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wockhardt, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Wockhardt USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wockhardt USA LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
VKT Pharma Private Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
VKT Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Unique Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Torrent Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. f/k/a Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Strides Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Strides Pharma Science Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Strides Pharma Global Pte. Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Auro Health LLC
|
|
Defendant
Apotex, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Apotex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda Repository, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amerisource Health Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cadila Healthcare Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
APPCO Pharma, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals International, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Heritage Pharma Labs Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Granules USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Granules India, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Golden State Medical Supply, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Glenmark Generics Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories SA
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Denton Pharma Inc. d/b/a Northwind Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Contract Pharmacal Corp.,
|
|
Defendant
Chattem, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Zielinski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carla Zielinski
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 07, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
order
Administrative Order ~Util - Terminate Case Associations
Wed 06/08 3:35 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASE. Case is Deconsolidated from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. Case remains closed. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Thu 05/26 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Carla Zielinski, Robert Zielinski. Attorney Patrick Pantazis added to party Carla Zielinski(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Pantazis added to party Robert Zielinski(pty:pla). (Pantazis, Patrick) |
|
Monday, December 21, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 12/21 1:27 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Fifth Amended Short-Form Complaint against Amerisource Health Services, LLC, Apotex Corp., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Boehringer Ingelheim, Cardinal Health, Inc., Chattem Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories SA, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Geri-Care, GlaxoSmithKline, Granules USA, Inc., J B Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd., L. Perrigo Company, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Ranbaxy Inc., Sanofi, Sanofi S.A., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Unique Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Wockhardt, Ltd., filed by Robert Zielinski, Carla Zielinski.(Pantazis, Evan) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 11/23 5:30 PM
Fourth MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth Amended Short-Form Complaint against Amerisource Health Services, LLC, Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Granules USA, Inc., J B Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd., McKesson Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Unique Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Wockhardt, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sanofi, Ranbaxy, Inc., L. Perrigo Company, GlaxoSmithKline, Geri-Care, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Boehringer Ingelheim, Apotex Corp., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., filed by Robert Zielinski, Carla Zielinski.(Pantazis, Evan) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 10/19 1:24 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Short-Form Complaint against Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Ajanta Pharma USA Inc., Amerisource Health Services, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Anda Repository, LLC, Apotex Corporation, Apotex, Inc., Auro Health LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Cardinal Health, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Contract Pharmacal Corp.,, Denton Pharma Inc. d/b/a Northwind Pharmaceuticals, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories SA, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Glenmark Generics Ltd, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA, Golden State Medical Supply, Inc., Granules India, Ltd., Granules USA, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals International, Ltd., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., J B Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd., L. Perrigo Co., McKesson Corporation, Mylan Institutional LLC, Mylan Laboratories Ltd., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Novitium Pharma LLC, PAI Holdings, LLC, formerly known as Pharmaceutical Associates, Inc., Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC, Perrigo Company, Perrigo Company, plc, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Pfizer Inc., Precision Dose Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Unique Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Watson Laboratories Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC, Wockhardt USA, Inc., Wockhardt, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging, Amneal Pharamaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Appco Pharma LLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals International, Ltd. f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals International, Ltd., Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC, Mylan N.V., PAI Holdings, LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., Glaxosmithkline plc., Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc, Ajanta Pharma Ltd., filed by Robert Zielinski, Carla Zielinski.(Pantazis, Evan) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 10/09 12:05 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Short-Form Complaint against ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc., APPCO Pharma, LLC, Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Ajanta Pharma USA Inc., Amerisource Health Services, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Anda Repository, LLC, Apotex Corporation, Apotex, Inc., Auro Health LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Cardinal Health, Inc., Chattem Inc., Chattem, Inc., Contract Pharmacal Corp.,, Denton Pharma Inc. d/b/a Northwind Pharmaceuticals, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories SA, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Glenmark Generics Ltd, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA, Golden State Medical Supply, Inc., Granules India, Ltd., Granules USA, Inc., Heritage Pharma Labs Inc., Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals International, Ltd., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., J B Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd., L. Perrigo Co., McKesson Corporation, Methapharm, Inc., Mylan Institutional LLC, Mylan Laboratories Ltd., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Novitium Pharma LLC, PAI Holdings, LLC, formerly known as Pharmaceutical Associates, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC, Perrigo Company, Perrigo Company, plc, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Pfizer Inc., Precision Dose Inc., Ranbaxy Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Strides Pharma Global Pte. Ltd., Strides Pharma Science Ltd., Strides Pharma, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. f/k/a Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Unique Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., VKT Pharma Inc., VKT Pharma Private Ltd., Watson Laboratories Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC, Wockhardt USA, Inc., Wockhardt, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., filed by Robert Zielinski, Carla Zielinski.(Pantazis, Evan) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued
Tue 10/06 1:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc., J B Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Unique Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.. (cqs) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Tue 10/06 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Carla Zielinski, Robert Zielinski (Pantazis, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s) Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) Unique Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) J B Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd. | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued
Tue 10/06 7:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Methapharm, Inc.. (cqs) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 10/05 4:09 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Robert Zielinski, Carla Zielinski.(Pantazis, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s) | ||
17 | 17
order
Clerks Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES)
Mon 10/05 2:24 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (cqs) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Mon 10/05 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Carla Zielinski, Robert Zielinski (Pantazis, Evan) |
|
Friday, July 17, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 07/17 6:33 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Robert Zielinski, Carla Zielinski.(Pantazis, Evan) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Administrative Order
Mon 04/27 3:08 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 04/01 5:03 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Western District of Kentucky. Case Number 3:20-cv-00161 with documents 1-10. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80569-RLR on 4/1/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
12 | 12
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/01 3:40 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 04/01 3:37 PM
Case transferred in from Kentucky Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00161. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-9 from the Southern District of Florida re MDL No.2924. (JM) | |
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Removal of Attorney Seth D. Gray by Carla Zielinski, Robert Zielinski (White, Matthew) Modified text on 3/30/2020 (JM). | |
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 Proposed Agreed Order FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Corley, Jessica) | |
7 | 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Corley, Jessica) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica P. Corley on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Corley, Jessica) | |
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Show Cause Order by Plaintiffs Carla Zielinski, Robert Zielinski (White, Matthew) | |
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 SHOW CAUSE ORDER signed by Judge Justin R. Walker on 3/6/2020. Plaintiffs may seek leave to amend their Complaint to address the jurisdictional defect. If Plaintiffs choose to seek leave to amend their Complaint, their deadline is 3/27/2020, with response and reply deadlines in accordance with the Local Rules. cc: Counsel (SMJ) | |
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlazoSmithKline, LLC, and Sanofi US Services Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DLW) | |
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DLW) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlazoSmithKline, LLC, and Sanofi US Services Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3055238, filed by Robert Zielinski and Carla Zielinski. (DLW) (DLW). |