MCKINNEY v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80573 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | District of Columbia, 1:20-cv-00646 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 29, 2020 5:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Robin Sharif McKinney
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 08/21 12:25 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Robin Sharis McKinney.(Jung, Je) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Administrative Order
Mon 04/27 3:08 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Thu 04/02 9:17 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Columbia. Case Number 1:20-cv-00646 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80573-RLR on 4/2/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
8 | 8
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 04/02 9:11 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Thu 04/02 9:08 AM
Case transferred in from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-00646. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr) | |
5 | 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) dated 3/31/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Robin L. Rosenberg for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2924) (ztnr) | |
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 03/18/2020. (lcrdm2, ) | |
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, PFIZER INC., SANOFI US SERVICES, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET corrected by ROBIN SHARIS MCKINNEY re1 Complaint, filed by ROBIN SHARIS MCKINNEY. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by ROBIN SHARIS MCKINNEY.(Jung, Je) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6891988) filed by ROBIN SHARIS MCKINNEY.(Jung, Je) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Boehringer, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Sanofi, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Chattem, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Pfizer, | ||
Att: 6 Summons GSK | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) |