Economy v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-02400 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Northern, 1:20-cv-00940 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 06, 2020 3:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alice Bolles Economy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago |
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00940. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Thu 04/09 1:30 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Georgia Northern, 1:20-cv-00940, Economy v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 20-cv-02400 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 198 cc: JPMDL (jlgS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, April 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Civil Case Terminated. (tmf) | ||
Case electronically transferred to USDC-NDCA. (tmf) | ||
Notification of Docket Correction re8 MDL Conditional Transfer Order, (tmf). (tmf) | ||
Thursday, April 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Submission of1 Complaint for Review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop) | ||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |