Austermann v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80655 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Eastern, 4:20-cv-00473 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 17, 2020 5:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Services, Inc.
Reg. Agent CT Corporation 120 S. Central Ave.
Clayton, MO 63105 |
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Austermann
2001 Meadow Brook Lane
Pacific, MO 63039 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 25, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Wed 11/25 10:06 AM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Services, Inc., filed by Arthur Austermann.(O'Brien, James) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Administrative Order
Mon 04/27 3:27 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 04/20 4:07 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Eastern District of Missouri. Case Number 4:20-cv-00473-DDN with documents 1-10. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80655-RLR on 4/20/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
12 | 12
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/20 9:54 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 04/20 9:50 AM
Case transferred in from Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00473. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Southern District of Florida. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) | |
9 | 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel (DLB) | |
Monday, April 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Arthur Austermann. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (O'Brien, James) | |
7 | 7 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiff Arthur Austermann. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 4/16/2020.) (AFC) | |
Friday, April 03, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) | |
Case Opening Notification: 4 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Jason V. O'Brien. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG) | ||
Thursday, April 02, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Arthur Austermann Process Server: Sheriff of Cole County (O'Brien, James) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Arthur Austermann Process Server: Sheriff of Cole County (O'Brien, James) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Arthur Austermann Process Server: Sheriff of St. Louis County (O'Brien, James) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Arthur Austermann Process Server: Sheriff of St. Louis County (O'Brien, James) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7847359, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Arthur Austermann.(O'Brien, James) (MFG). | |
Att: 1 Summons Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons | ||
Att: 5 (4/3/2020) Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 (4/3/2020) Original Filing Form |