Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:20-cv-01741
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Feb 19, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 20, 2020 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Randstad General Partner (US) LLC
Represented By
Misty Martin
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Benjamin D. Briggs
Seyfarth Shaw-Atlanta
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachelle Justice
Represented By
Regan E. Keebaugh
Radford & Keebaugh, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Randstad North America, Inc.
Terminated: 06/11/2020


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Friday, February 19, 2021
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Fri 02/19 10:44 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING32 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (jed)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 02/19 10:45 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas terminated from case. (jed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/18 9:26 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice) by Randstad General Partner (US) LLC. (Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
31 31 5 pgs notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/28 8:08 AM
TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (ddm) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
30 30 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/15 5:18 PM
NOTICE by Randstad General Partner (US) LLC Notice of Resolution (Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
29 29 5 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/09 9:15 AM
NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
28 28 30+ pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/27 12:46 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re27 Motion for Entry Of Confidentiality Agreement And Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/27/2020. (jed)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
27 27 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/26 12:21 PM
Joint MOTION For Entry Of Confidentiality Agreement And Stipulated Protective Order by Randstad General Partner (US) LLC.(Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 - Confidentiality Agreement And Stipulated Protective Order
Friday, October 09, 2020
26 26 discov Certificate of Service Fri 10/09 1:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Randstad General Partner (US) LLC.(Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Fri 10/09 1:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Objections and Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Randstad General Partner (US) LLC.(Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/29 12:04 PM
EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
23 23 discov Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 2:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re Defendants First Request For Production Of Documents To Plaintiff Rachelle Justice by Randstad General Partner (US) LLC.(Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
22 22 discov Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 2:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re: Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Randstad General Partner (US) LLC.(Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/02 10:09 AM
SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 20, 2020
20 20 order Scheduling Order Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Thu 08/20 11:59 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT INSTRUCTIONS: re:19 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 12/17/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/19/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/26/2021. (See order for detailed instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 8/20/2020. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
19 19 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 08/19 2:56 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Randstad General Partner (US) LLC. (Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
18 18 discov Certificate of Service Wed 08/19 11:36 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Rachelle Justice.(Keebaugh, Regan)
Related: [-]
17 17 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 08/19 11:16 AM
Initial Disclosures by Randstad General Partner (US) LLC.(Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 08/19 10:11 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Rachelle Justice. (Keebaugh, Regan)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 08/19 10:03 AM
Initial Disclosures by Rachelle Justice.(Keebaugh, Regan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/04 11:01 AM
SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (jpa) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/23 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D. Briggs on behalf of Randstad General Partner (US) LLC (Briggs, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 07/20 5:11 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Randstad General Partner (US) LLC identifying Corporate Parent Randstad North America, Inc., Other Affiliate Randstad Luxembourg UK Limited, Other Affiliate Randstad Holding NV for Randstad General Partner (US) LLC. (Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
11 11 27 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 07/20 5:01 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Randstad General Partner (US) LLC. Discovery ends on 12/17/2020.(Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/20 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Misty Martin on behalf of Randstad General Partner (US) LLC (Martin, Misty)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/13 10:57 AM
FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (ddm) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/02 9:02 AM
FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2020
utility Docket Correction Fri 06/12 10:23 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rachelle Justice. Randstad General Partner (US) LLC waiver mailed on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Keebaugh, Regan) Modified on 6/12/2020 to edit dates (jed). (jed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/11 6:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rachelle Justice. Randstad General Partner (US) LLC waiver mailed on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Keebaugh, Regan)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 06/11 6:37 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Randstad General Partner (US) LLCwith Jury Demand filed by Rachelle Justice.(Keebaugh, Regan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/27 9:48 AM
THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/04 11:42 AM
SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 04/24 4:05 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Randstad North America, Inc. (jap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
2 2 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/24 4:04 PM
Amended General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/2020. (jap)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/24 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rachelle Justice (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9624577). (jap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet