Allen et al v. Whitmer
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | George Caram Steeh |
Referred: | Michael J Hluchaniuk |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-11020 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 22, 2020 5:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Gretchen Whitmer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lyn Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cincinnatus, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
![]() MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to30 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment,28 Notice of Appeal filed by Lyn Allen, Cincinnatus, LLC [Appeal Case Number 21-1019 (TTho) |
|
Monday, July 26, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
![]() OPINION from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re28 Notice of Appeal filed by Lyn Allen, Cincinnatus, LLC [Appeal Case Number 21-1019 (TTho) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Certificate of Service re28 Notice of Appeal. (TTho) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Plaintiffs re27 Judgment. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8267762 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Ellison, Philip) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
![]() JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) |
|
26 | 26
![]() ORDER Granting Defendant's20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
![]() REPLY Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Gretchen Whitmer. (Froehlich, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
![]() STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of20 MOTION to Dismiss Brief in Support and Certificate of Service : Reply due by 9/24/2020 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
![]() RESPONSE to20 MOTION to Dismiss Brief in Support and Certificate of Service filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellison, Philip) |
|
order
Text-Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 08/31 2:26 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting22 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Lyn Allen, Cincinnatus, LLC. Entered by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) |
||
Saturday, August 29, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Lyn Allen, Cincinnatus, LLC. (Ellison, Philip) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
![]() STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline for Plaintiff's Response to20 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 9/1/2020 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
order
Text-Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 07/29 8:49 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting19 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief in Support and Certificate of Service filed by Gretchen Whitmer. Entered by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Brief in Support and Certificate of Service by Gretchen Whitmer. (Froehlich, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
19 | 19
![]() MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief in Support and Certificate of Service by Gretchen Whitmer. (Froehlich, Joseph) |
|
Friday, July 17, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER Denying Defendant's11 Motion to Dismiss as Moot. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() RESPONSE to11 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellison, Philip) |
|
16 | 16
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Lyn Allen, Cincinnatus, LLC against Gretchen Whitmer. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Ellison, Philip) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER Denying Plaintiffs'12 Motion to Exclude Exhibits. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() REPLY to Response re12 MOTION re11 MOTION to Dismiss to Exclude Exhibits Pursuant to Rule 12(d) or Alternatively to Strike filed by Lyn Allen, Cincinnatus, LLC. (Ellison, Philip) |
|
13 | 13
![]() RESPONSE to12 MOTION re11 MOTION to Dismiss to Exclude Exhibits Pursuant to Rule 12(d) or Alternatively to Strike filed by Gretchen Whitmer. (Froehlich, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
order
Text-Only Order
Thu 06/25 12:47 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Defendant must file a response to Plaintiff's12 MOTION re11 MOTION to Dismiss to Exclude Exhibits Pursuant to Rule 12(d) or Alternatively to Strike filed by Lyn Allen, Cincinnatus, LLC bye July 8, 2020 . Entered by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) |
||
Wednesday, June 24, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION re11 MOTION to Dismiss to Exclude Exhibits Pursuant to Rule 12(d) or Alternatively to Strike by Lyn Allen, Cincinnatus, LLC. (Ellison, Philip) |
|
11 | 11
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by Gretchen Whitmer. (Froehlich, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gretchen Whitmer. (Froehlich, Joseph) |
|
order
Text-Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 06/24 1:27 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting10 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Gretchen Whitmer. Entered by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) |
||
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Gronda on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gronda, Matthew) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew F. Fink, III appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fink, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, April 28, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Gretchen Whitmer waiver sent on 4/25/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. (Froehlich, Joseph) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher M. Allen appearing on behalf of Gretchen Whitmer with Certificate of Service (Allen, Christopher) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua O. Booth appearing on behalf of Gretchen Whitmer with Certificate of Service (Booth, Joshua) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John G. Fedynsky appearing on behalf of Gretchen Whitmer with Certificate of Service (Fedynsky, John) |
|
3 | 3
![]() ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph T. Froehlich appearing on behalf of Gretchen Whitmer with Certificate of Service (Froehlich, Joseph) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() SUMMONS Issued for *Gretchen Whitmer* (DAll) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Mon 04/27 11:18 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DAll) |
||
Saturday, April 25, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Gretchen Whitmer. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7762968 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Ellison, Philip) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |