JONES v. MAINE CAT CATAMARANS INC et al
Maine District Court | |
Judge: | John C Nivison |
Referred: | John C Nivison |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00161 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2020 |
Re-opened: | Oct 06, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 04, 2020 3:32 AM EST |
Defaulted Party
MAINE CAT CATAMARANS INC
|
Represented By
|
Defaulted Party
RICHARD VERMEULEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN JONES
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
86 | 86
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Tue 05/28 11:24 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re10 Order on Motion to Amend with Certificate of Service by BRIAN JONES.(CRESWELL, RANDY) |
|
Att: 1 Satisfaction of Judgment |