Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC v. Blackrock Millwork Company, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12539
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12539
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01085 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Blackrock Millwork Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC
100 Sinatra Drive
Hoboken, NJ 07030 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 28 2020
Decision signed on 10/28/2020 regarding claim for prejudgment interest on default judgment (related document(s)1). (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 11/02 1:25 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1085 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
||
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Wed 10/28 6:18 PM
Order and Judgment signed on 10/28/2020. Judgment entered that plaintiff Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC be awarded JUDGMENT in its favor against defendant Blackrock Millwork Company, LLC in the amount of $29,674.00, plus pre-judgment interest in the amount of $621.93, as well as costs in the amount of $350.00, for an award as of October 28, 2020 of $30,645.93, with post-judgment interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 20,0031 (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
15 | 15
11
pgs
order
Written Opinion
Wed 10/28 4:42 PM
Decision signed on 10/28/2020 regarding claim for prejudgment interest on default judgment . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Response
Wed 09/16 4:29 PM
Amended Response to Motion /Tapmasters Hoboken - Blackrock Millwork - Amended Exhibit List - Inquest filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. with hearing to be held on 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Conway, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Declaration
Wed 09/16 4:23 PM
Declaration of Willie Mingo in Support of Default Judgment filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. with hearing to be held on 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Conway, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Declaration
Wed 09/16 2:19 PM
Declaration of Jesse Singh - Direct Testimony filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. with hearing to be held on 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Conway, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion, Default Judgment
Tue 09/15 8:35 PM
Motion for Default Judgment DEBTORS EXHIBIT LIST FOR SEPTEMBER 17, 2020 EVIDENTIARY HEARING filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. with hearing to be held on 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Conway, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Motion, Default Judgment
Tue 09/15 8:33 PM
Motion for Default Judgment DEBTORS WITNESS LIST FOR SEPTEMBER 17, 2020 EVIDENTIARY HEARING filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. with hearing to be held on 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Conway, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/26 4:22 PM
Order signed on 8/26/2020 declaring default and scheduling inquest . Hearing on inquest on damages to be held on 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW). (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Mon 07/27 1:27 PM
Notice of Proposed Order and Judgment filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. with presentment to be held on 8/11/2020 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Objections due by 8/6/2020, (Conway, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
41
pgs
misc
Transcript
Wed 07/22 10:54 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 07/02/20 at 10:00 A.M. RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/20/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: AA EXPRESS TRANSCRIPTS.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/29/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/24/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/20/2020. (Su, Kevin) |
|
Sunday, June 28, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 06/29 12:13 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 06/28/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 06/26 10:21 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Blackrock Millwork Company, LLC. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 06/25 4:54 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 06/18 11:42 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/2/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Conway, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 12, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 05/12 1:36 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 6/11/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 05/11 4:02 PM
Adversary case 20-01085 Complaint against Blackrock Millwork Company, LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |