Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC v. Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12539
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12539
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01086 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 17, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tejas Joshi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Minal Joshi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC
320 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
order
Motion, Approve Compromise
Thu 06/17 12:44 PM
Order signed on 6/17/2021 granting motion seeking approval of settlement with Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Tejas Joshi and Minal Joshi . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 06/17 12:48 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1086 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
||
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Letter
Thu 06/03 6:20 PM
Letter Confirming Adjournment of Pretrial Conference from June 8, 2021 to June 22, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 28, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 05/28 5:34 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
37 | 37
motion
Motion, Approve Compromise
Fri 05/28 11:41 AM
Joint Motion to Approve Compromise on Presentment of Order filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC Responses due by 6/9/2021,. (Conway, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 11, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Tue 05/11 12:19 PM
Letter Confirming Adjournment of Pretrial Conference from June 1, 2021 to June June 8, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 05, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Letter
Wed 05/05 9:08 AM
Letter Adjourning Pre-Trial Conference from May 26 to June 1, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 27, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Letter
Tue 04/27 1:09 PM
Letter /Response to Letter of Judith Rosenthal Dated 4-27-21 Filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Letter
Tue 04/27 12:08 PM
Letter to Hon. Michael Wiles Filed by Judith L Rosenthal on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi.(Rosenthal, Judith) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum/Ad Testificandum | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Gmail re Subpoena d.t./a.t. | ||
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Letter
Mon 04/26 4:05 PM
Letter Seeking Court Assistance with Discovery Dispute Filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 25, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 03/25 8:13 AM
Fourth Amended Scheduling Order signed on 3/25/2021 . Final pre-trial conference adjourned to 5/26/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (MEW). (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/29 2:30 PM
Third Amended Scheduling Order Signed on 1/29/2021. The Final Pre-Trial Conference Will be Held on 5/26/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (MEW). (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 12/17 4:22 PM
Second Amended Scheduling Order Signed on 12/17/2020. The Pre-Trial Conference Will be Held on 3/30/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (MEW). (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 10/20 10:34 PM
Amended Scheduling Order signed on 10/20/2020 . Final pre-trial conference adjourned to 3/30/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (MEW). (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
answer
None
Wed 10/07 2:39 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Mitchell D. Cohen on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi. (Cohen, Mitchell) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Tue 09/29 1:43 PM
Stipulation of Withdrawal for Judith L. Rosenthal as Counsel to Defendants Filed by Mitchell D. Cohen on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi. (Cohen, Mitchell) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Fri 09/18 12:28 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Mitchell D. Cohen on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi.(Cohen, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 09/15 1:01 PM
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 20-cv-7551 Judge Gregory H. Woods (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
Notice, Appeal (fee)
Fri 09/04 4:39 PM
Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Mitchell D. Cohen on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi. (Cohen, Mitchell) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Fri 09/04 4:24 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Kevin J Etzel on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi. (Etzel, Kevin) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Fri 09/04 4:21 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Mitchell D. Cohen on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi. (Cohen, Mitchell) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 09/04 4:42 PM
Receipt of Notice of Appeal([LINK 20-01086 mew] ) [appeal,97] ( 298.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14291563. Fee amount 298.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
order
~Generic~ Order
Mon 08/24 4:14 PM
Order signed on 8/24/2020 denying plaintiff's request for rule 9011 sanctions . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 08/21 1:31 PM
Order signed on 8/21/2020 denying motion to reconsider . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Statement
Fri 08/07 2:11 PM
Statement /Letter to Judge Wiles filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Reply
Thu 08/06 2:49 PM
Reply to Motion Reply Brief filed by Judith L Rosenthal on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi. (Rosenthal, Judith) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Opposition
Wed 08/05 3:45 PM
Opposition /DEBTORS OPPOSITION TO (i) MOTION FOR REARGUMENT AND RECONSIDERATION UNDER FED. BANKR. R. 9023-1 AND (ii) MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS JULY 8, 2020 ORDER DENYING THE PRIOR MOTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND UNDER FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(e), 12(b)(2), (5) and (6) filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Statement
Wed 07/29 4:47 PM
Supplemental Statement July 27, 2020 Order entered by Superior Court of NJ with transmittal letter --supplement to Motion for Rehearing/Reconsideration/Dismissal filed by Judith L Rosenthal on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi. (Rosenthal, Judith) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 07/27 11:53 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Supplemental Submission filed by Judith L Rosenthal on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi. (Rosenthal, Judith) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 07/22 4:46 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and for Rehearing/Reconsideration filed by Judith L Rosenthal on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi. with hearing to be held on 8/12/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Responses due by 8/5/2020, (Rosenthal, Judith) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Brief in support of Rehearing/Reconsideration/Dismissal | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certification of Counsel with 2 Exhibits | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Certification of Minal Joshi | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Certification of Tejas Joshi, M.D. | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Cert. of Service | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
41
pgs
misc
Transcript
Wed 07/22 10:58 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 07/02/20 at 10:00 A.M. RE: Pre-Trial Conference; Motion To Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/20/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: AA EXPRESS TRANSCRIPTS.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/29/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/24/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/20/2020. (Su, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/15 10:25 AM
Scheduling Order signed on 7/15/2020. Final pre-trial conference to be held on 1/21/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW). (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Motion, Dismiss Case
Wed 07/08 8:43 AM
Order signed on 7/8/2020 denying motion to dismiss without prejudice . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Declaration
Tue 06/30 4:21 PM
Declaration OF MICHAEL T. CONWAY IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/2/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Conway, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Declaration
Tue 06/30 4:19 PM
Declaration OF WILLIE J. MINGO filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/2/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Conway, Michael) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Reply
Mon 06/29 3:17 PM
Reply to Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint filed by Judith L Rosenthal on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi. (Rosenthal, Judith) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certification of N. Patel | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of Filing and Service | ||
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Opposition Brief
Thu 06/25 1:10 PM
Opposition Brief filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/2/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Conway, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 06/18 11:41 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/2/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Conway, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 06/12 12:43 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss filed by Judith L Rosenthal on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi. with hearing to be held on 7/2/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Objections due by 6/25/2020, (Rosenthal, Judith) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion, Dismiss Case
Thu 06/11 5:51 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Judith L Rosenthal on behalf of Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Minal Joshi, Tejas Joshi with hearing to be held on 7/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Responses due by 6/24/2020,. (Rosenthal, Judith) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Counsel | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibits 6-8 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibits 9-10.Dep Transcripts | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 11.Order | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exh 12.Appendix IIB Notice | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exh 13-14 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exh 15.Mingo Resp to IS | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exh 16.Owens Cert | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exh 17.Emails | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exh 18.NOM Enf Lit Rights | ||
Att: 13 Proof of Filing and Service | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Tuesday, May 12, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 05/12 1:36 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 6/11/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 05/11 4:09 PM
Adversary case 20-01086 Complaint against Amba-Laxmi Holdings LLC, Tejas Joshi, Minal Joshi (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |