Karon et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Incorporated et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80779 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Arizona, 4:20-cv-00173 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 08, 2020 6:16 AM EST |
Defendant
L Perrigo Company
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Company
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Defendant
Target Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Safeway
|
|
Defendant
Dr Reddy's Laboratories Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Apotex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Albertsons Companies Incorporated
|
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Karon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Karon
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Perrigo Research & Development Company
Terminated: 04/28/2020
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Company PLC
Terminated: 04/28/2020
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 07, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
order
Administrative Order ~Util - Terminate Case Associations
Wed 06/08 3:35 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASE. Case is Deconsolidated from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. Case remains closed. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Thu 05/19 7:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Without Prejudice) by Adam Karon, Brenda Karon (Herz, Joel) |
|
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Thu 05/06 4:13 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Albertsons Companies Incorporated, Apotex Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, CVS Health Corporation, Chattem Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Dr Reddy's Laboratories Incorporated, L Perrigo Company, Perrigo Company PLC, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Safeway, Sanofi US Services Incorporated, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Target Corporation, Unknown Parties, Walgreen Company, Walmart Incorporated, filed by Brenda Karon, Adam Karon.(Herz, Joel) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 07/08 2:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brenda Karon, Adam Karon.(Herz, Joel) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Administrative Order
Wed 05/27 4:18 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 05/13 8:05 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Arizona. Case Number 4:20-cv-00173 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80779-RLR on 5/12/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, May 12, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 05/12 2:37 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Tue 05/12 2:34 PM
Case transferred in from Arizona; Case Number 4:20-cv-00173. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
7 | 7
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 05/12 10:10 AM
CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-15) Transferring Case to the Southern District of Florida Re MDL-2924. (MAP) |
|
misc
ICMS - converted docket entry
Tue 05/12 10:11 AM
Remark: Case Transferred to the Southern District of Florida via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
||
Tuesday, April 28, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brenda Karon, Adam Karon.(Herz, Joel) | |
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to Albertsons Companies Incorporated, Apotex Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, CVS Health Corporation, Chattem Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Dr Reddy's Laboratories Incorporated, Perrigo Company PLC, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Safeway, Sandoz Incorporated, Sanofi US Services Incorporated, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Target Corporation, Unknown Parties, Walgreen Company, Walmart Incorporated.(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) | |
3 | 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18209430. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-173-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) | |
2 | 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Adam Karon, Brenda Karon. (Herz, Joel)(MCO) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18209430 filed by Brenda Karon, Adam Karon. (Herz, Joel)(MCO) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |