MURDOCK v. GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC. USA
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80790 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 2:20-cv-05495 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 09, 2020 5:33 AM EST |
Defendant
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA
|
|
Plaintiff
STEVEN MURDOCK
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
order
MDL Order Dismissing Party
Wed 04/14 11:11 AM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES re10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/13/2021. Related Cases: 9:20-md-02924-RLR, 9:20-cv-80790-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Fri 04/09 6:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and MDL No. 2924 Pretrial Order #62 by STEVEN MURDOCK (Westcot, Sarah) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 04/09 6:10 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Nicole Westcot on behalf of STEVEN MURDOCK. Attorney Sarah Nicole Westcot added to party STEVEN MURDOCK(pty:pla). (Westcot, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Administrative Order
Wed 05/27 4:37 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 05/22 4:27 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by STEVEN MURDOCK. Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Westcot, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 05/13 3:24 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 2:20-cv-05495 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80790-RLR on 5/13/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 05/13 3:19 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 05/13 3:16 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 2:20-cv-05495. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
3 | 3
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Wed 05/13 2:11 PM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of Florida. (MDL 2924 Zantac Products Litigation CTO #16 - Judge Robin L. Rosenberg) (gh, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC. USA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) | |
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC. USA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10767159) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STEVEN MURDOCK.(OBERGFELL, ANDREW) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, ) |