Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:20-cv-03435
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 21, 2020
Case in other court:Alabama Northern, 4:20-cv-00145
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 17, 2020 1:28 AM PST
Defendant
Monsanto Company Corporation
Represented By
Joe G. Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Bryan Brown
Represented By
Donald P McKenna, Jr
Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton
contact info


Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Friday, May 29, 2020
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/29 9:13 AM
Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company Corporation. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 05/29 9:05 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company Corporation. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 05/29 9:00 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company Corporation. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 05/22 12:44 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00145. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
utility MDL Member Case Fri 05/22 12:45 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Northern District of Alabama, 4:20-cv-00145-JEO, Brown v. Monsanto Company Corporation, Opened in California Northern District as 20-cv-03435-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 188 cc: JPMDL (arkS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
5 5 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern California for inclusion in MDL 2741; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Northern California. (KAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Bryan Brown. Monsanto Company Corporation served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
3 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company Corporation mailed certified mail (KAM (Entered: 01/31/2020)
Related: [-]
2 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Amy Bryan Brown. (McKenna, Donald)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company Corporation, filed by Amy Bryan Brown.(KAM)
Related: [-]
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3526576. related document1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company Corporation, filed by Amy Bryan Brown.(KAM). (McKenna, Donald)
Related: [-]