Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50612
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 27, 2020
Terminated:Mar 24, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.
2949 S. Bridge Road
Washington, PA 15301
Represented By
Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43552
Represented By
Kevin A Guerke
Young Conaway
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, March 24, 2022
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 03/24 12:14 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Pakrouh, Tara)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 03/24 2:34 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50612 Closed (BJM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
28 28 court Case Reassigned Mon 03/21 1:11 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
27 27 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Fri 12/10 4:36 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Lemisch, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
26 26 notice Substitution of Counsel - Notice Thu 12/02 11:21 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Sally J. Daugherty, Esquire for William R. Firth, III, Esquire Filed by Earth Pipeline Services Inc., Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.. (Firth, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
25 25 notice Substitution of Counsel - Notice Mon 11/29 1:33 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel with Appearance of William R. Firth, III, Esq., and Withdrawal of Stephen A. Venzie, Esq. on behalf of Earth Pipeline Services Inc., Filed by Earth Pipeline Services Inc., Earth Pipeline Services, Inc... (Venzie, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
24 24 mediation Mediation Status Report Wed 10/06 11:33 AM
Mediation Status Report (Lemisch, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
23 23 court Mediator Report Past Due Wed 09/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 15, 2021
22 22 court Mediator Report Past Due Sun 08/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
21 21 mediation Mediation Status Report Wed 06/23 12:56 PM
Mediation Status Report (Lemisch, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/30 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/29 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
18 18 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Tue 04/27 11:29 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Raymond Lemisch is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 6/28/2021. Signed on 4/27/2021. (DMC)
Related: [-]
17 17 utility Corrective Entry Tue 04/27 11:27 AM
Corrective Entry - information not included. Related [+] (DMC)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Tue 04/27 10:08 AM
**ENTERED IN ERROR** Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Raymond H. Lemisch is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 7/27/2021. Signed on 4/27/2021. (Murin, Leslie) Modified on 4/27/2021 (DMC)
Related: [-] 9
15 15 utility Corrective Entry Tue 04/27 10:05 AM
Corrective Entry Related [+] (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 utility Corrective Entry Tue 04/27 8:17 AM
Corrective Entry Related [+] (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, April 26, 2021
13 13 court VAN-416 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation Mon 04/26 2:13 PM
***ENTERED IN ERROR***Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Raymond H. Lemisch is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 7/22/2021. Signed on 4/26/2021. (Murin, Leslie) Modified on 4/27/2021 (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 25, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/26 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/25/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, April 23, 2021
11 11 court VAN-416a Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Opt In Cert LR 9019-5j) Fri 04/23 4:31 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Raymond H. Lemisch is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediator Certificate of Completion due date: 7/22/2021. Signed on 4/23/2021. (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/23 9:55 AM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF AREPLACEMENT MEDIATOR Related [+] Order Signed on 4/23/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 9
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, April 22, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Thu 04/22 6:46 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Replacement Mediator Stipulation Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Guerke, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
8 8 6 pgs order Order Wed 12/23 8:45 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Related [+] Order Signed on 12/23/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
7 7 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/22 5:13 PM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
6 6 misc Status Report Mon 06/29 5:16 PM
Status Report jointly filed by Welded Constructions, L.P., Earth Pipeline Services, Inc. and Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Filed by Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.. (Daugherty, Sally)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance - Notice Mon 06/29 3:33 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Earth Pipeline Services, Inc. (Daugherty, Sally)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Mon 06/29 3:38 PM
Attorney Stephen Venzie and Sally K. Daugherty for Earth Pipeline Services, Inc. added to case Filed by Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.. (Daugherty, Sally)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/26 2:12 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Earth Pipeline Services, Inc. Mediation due date: 10/26/2020. (Daugherty, Sally)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 05/29 1:56 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.. Related [+] Tickle due by: 7/28/2020. (Guerke, Kevin)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 ADR Notice
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 05/27 9:56 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50612 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9793645, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 05/27 9:54 PM
Adversary case 20-50612 Complaint Complaint and Objection to Proof of Claim Number 592 Filed by Earth Pipeline Services, Inc. by Welded Construction, L.P. against Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))). AP Summons Served due date: 8/25/2020. (Guerke, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Part 1
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Part 2
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Part 3
Att: 4 Exhibit B
Att: 5 Exhibit C
Att: 6 Exhibit D