Vanderheiden et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80936 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Nebraska, 8:20-cv-00202 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 08, 2020 4:20 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Servces Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Misty Vanderheiden, NE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Vanderheiden, NE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
order
MDL Order Dismissing Party
Thu 02/03 4:23 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/3/2022. Related Cases: 9:20-md-02924-RLR, 9:20-cv-80936-RLR See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, November 19, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 11/19 9:13 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. In Pretrial Order # 39, the Court required dismissals of entire actions to be accomplished by filing a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Plaintiffs have nevertheless filed a Motion to Dismiss this case22 . The Court construes the Motion to Dismiss as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Plaintiffs' request for an order of dismissal is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/19/2021. (sk01) |
||
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss
Thu 11/18 4:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Misty Vanderheiden, Patrick Vanderheiden. Responses due by 12/2/2021 (Domina, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF
Wed 03/10 4:55 PM
Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sanofi SA, Pfizer, Inc., Walgreens, Co., Walgreens Food Alliance, Inc. and Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Williams, Christian) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 03/01 6:42 PM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Patrick Vanderheiden, Misty Vanderheiden.(Williams, Christian) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Thu 01/07 11:19 PM
Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Servces Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, filed by Patrick Vanderheiden, Misty Vanderheiden.(Williams, Christian) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Administrative Order
Thu 06/25 2:36 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Fri 06/12 8:59 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Nebraska. Case Number 20-cv-00202 with documents 1-14. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80936-RLR on 6/11/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 06/11 4:11 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
15 | 15
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Thu 06/11 3:56 PM
Case transferred in from Nebraska; Case Number 8:20-cv-00202. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). |
|
14 | 14
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Thu 06/11 2:20 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924.(LKO) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
13 | 13
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Thu 06/11 8:43 AM
COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (LKO) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Thu 06/11 2:27 PM
Case transferred to District of Southern District of Florida. Original electronic file sent. (LKO) |
||
Tuesday, June 02, 2020 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER - that Defendants' Agreed Motion to Stay (Filing No.8 ) is granted and all proceedings in this action are hereby stayed pending its transfer to MDL 2924. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO) | |
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
11 | 11 LETTER by Clerk regarding Notice of Removal1 with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LRM) | |
10 | 10 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Julia Zousmer has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) | |
9 | 9 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert B. Friedman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) | |
8 | 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Servces Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Huffer, Michael) | |
7 | 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew T. Bayman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) | |
6 | 6 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) | |
5 | 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Sanofi U.S. Services Inc. for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc..(Huffer, Michael) | |
4 | 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Chattem, Inc.. by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Chattem, Inc., Sanofi.(Huffer, Michael) | |
3 | 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Servces Inc.. by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Sanofi US Servces Inc., Sanofi.(Huffer, Michael) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Request for Location of Trial by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Servces Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Huffer, Michael) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Merrick County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-47 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4168775) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Sanofi US Servces Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Huffer, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 |