Crossfit, Inc. v. National Strength and Conditioning Association
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Janis L Sammartino |
Referred: | Karen S Crawford |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-01191 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2014 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 20, 2015 1:09 PM PST |
Defendant
National Strength and Conditioning Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crossfit, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Major Victory for CrossFit: Judge Orders Terminating And Massive Monetary Sanctions Against the NSCA (crossfit.com) |
Submitted Fri 12/06/2019 | |
2. | CrossFit, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Terminating Sanctions Against the NSCA (crossfit.com) |
Submitted Tue 06/25/2019 | |
3. | CrossFit Inc. is Suing the National Strength and Conditioning Association (therussellsblog.com) |
Submitted Fri 06/13/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
431 | 431
![]() ORDER Approving430 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice. All claims in the above-captioned action asserted by CrossFit against NSCA are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court SHALL CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/8/2021. (tcf) |
|
430 | 430
![]() Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice by Crossfit, Inc.. (Deagle, Wynter) |
|
429 | 429
![]() NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Crossfit, Inc. re428 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice filed by Crossfit, Inc. . (Dao, Anne-Marie) |
|
Wednesday, April 07, 2021 | ||
428 | 428
![]() Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice by Crossfit, Inc.. (Dao, Anne-Marie) |