Howard v. St. Louis City Justice Center et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen N Limbaugh, Jr |
Case #: | 4:20-cv-00868 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2020 |
Defendant
St. Louis City Justice Center
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Clark
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Walsh
|
|
Plaintiff
Charl Fitzgerald Howard
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter re:Frap
Tue 10/06 5:38 PM
Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (CSG) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal 28:1915(e)(2)(B)
Tue 10/06 5:34 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this order of dismissal would not betaken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/6/20. (CSG) |
|
8 | 8
11
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Tue 10/06 5:32 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Charl Fitzgerald Howard,4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Charl Fitzgerald Howard. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (DocketNo. 2) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $11.40 within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prisonregistration number; (3) the case number; and ( 4) the statement that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No. 4) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/27/2020.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/6/20. (CSG) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 10/06 5:34 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8,9. Tue Oct 6 17:34:36 CDT 2020 (Gould, Cathy) |
||
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
misc
Remark
Fri 09/04 3:26 PM
***REMARK Copy of Docket sheet forwarded to Charl Howard. (CMH) |
||
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certified Inmate Account Statement
Fri 09/04 3:25 PM
Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Charl Fitzgerald Howard. (CMH) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit
Fri 09/04 3:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT re1 DCM Complaint, by Plaintiff Charl Fitzgerald Howard. (CMH) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Request (NOT TO BE USED AS A MOTION)
Fri 09/04 3:23 PM
Request by Plaintiff Charl Fitzgerald Howard. (CMH) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Tue 06/30 9:47 AM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) |
||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Tue 06/30 9:49 AM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (DLB) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Tue 06/30 10:02 AM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Jun 30 10:02:29 CDT 2020 (admin,) |
||
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 06/30 9:47 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Charl Fitzgerald Howard. (DLB) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certified Inmate Account Statement
Tue 06/30 9:45 AM
Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Charl Fitzgerald Howard. (DLB) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case - 42:1983)
Tue 06/30 9:44 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Plaintiff Charl Fitzgerald Howard. (DLB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
DCM Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Tue 06/30 9:42 AM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 1983 against defendant Unknown Clark, St. Louis City Justice Center, Unknown Walsh Jury Demand,, filed by Charl Fitzgerald Howard.(DLB) |
|
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |