Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03028
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2020
Terminated:Nov 29, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Laguna Dana Investments, LLC
505 Bath Street c/o Patrick N. Smith
Santa Barbara, CA 93101
Represented By
Laguna Dana Investments, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Avila Beach Realty, Inc.
505 Bath Street c/o Patrick N. Smith
Santa Barbara, CA 93101
Represented By
Avila Beach Realty, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Weber Seror LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/29 12:25 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3028. (ckk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
73 73 order Dismiss Case Wed 11/23 12:49 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. Case Management Action due after 12/7/2022. (ds)
Related: [-] 71 Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Counter-Defendant James Gansman, Plaintiff James Gansman
72 72 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/23 10:55 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 71 Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
71 71 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/23 10:42 AM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Case Management Action due after 12/7/2022. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant James Gansman, Plaintiff James Gansman