Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03033
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2020
Terminated:Oct 06, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Joseph Ness, an individual
523 115th Avenue Southeast
Lake Stevens, WA 98528
Represented By
Joseph Ness
contact info
Defendant
Danielle Ness, an individual
523 115th Avenue Southeast
Lake Stevens, WA 98528
Represented By
Danielle Ness
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Steven T. Gubner
Brutzkus And Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Address (Multi) Wed 01/12 10:25 AM
Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Firm Name . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/06 2:49 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3033. (rdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/21 2:41 PM
Certificate of Service re Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
12 12 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 09/21 2:39 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Complaint Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Case Management Action due after 10/5/2020. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
11 11 audio audio Tue 09/08 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/3/2020 2:00:00 PM ]. File Size [ 21757 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:30:39 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 05, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Sat 09/05 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 09/05/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order
Thursday, September 03, 2020
9 9 3 pgs order Order Thu 09/03 5:55 PM
Order Following Scheduling Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 09/03 2:44 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Joseph Rothberg appeared for the Plaintiff. At least 24 hours prior to the continued scheduling conference, a pre-hearing statement shall be filed and served regarding the status of negotiations. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Thursday, July 30, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/31 8:50 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Joseph Ness . (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/06 3:51 PM
Summons Service Executed on Danielle Ness 7/6/2020; Joseph Ness 7/6/2020 . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/02 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/02/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/02 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/02/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/02 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/02/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Tue 06/30 3:01 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (klr)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 06/30 3:00 PM
Summons Issued on Danielle Ness Answer Due 7/30/2020; Joseph Ness Answer Due 7/30/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 9/3/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (klr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/30 10:38 AM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03033 . 11 Related [+] Complaint by James Gansman against Joseph Ness, Danielle Ness. Fee Amount $350. (Gubner, Steven)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet