Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03038
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2020
Terminated:Sep 11, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stanislaus Surgical Hospital LLC
1421 Oakdale Road
Modesto, CA 95355
Represented By
Stanislaus Surgical Hospital LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Weber Seror LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, September 11, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/11 3:15 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3038. (rs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Thu 08/27 11:45 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) In light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (#6) filed by Plaintiff on 8/25/2020, the September 10, 2020 scheduling conference is hereby VACATED. Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued,6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
court Hearing Dropped Thu 08/27 11:46 AM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] Off calendar per order on 8/27/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/25 10:49 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/25 10:36 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (with Prejudice) Case Management Action due after 09/8/2020. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/06 3:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on Stanislaus Surgical Hospital LLC 7/6/2020 . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 04, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/04 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Wed 07/01 9:26 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (tp)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 07/01 9:24 PM
Summons Issued on Stanislaus Surgical Hospital LLC Answer Due 7/31/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 9/10/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (tp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/30 11:53 AM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03038 . 11 Related [+] Complaint by James Gansman against Stanislaus Surgical Hospital LLC. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet