Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03043
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2020
Terminated:Jan 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Independent Chute Company, a Washington Partnership
38125 2nd Ave. S
Roy, WA 98580
Represented By
Independent Chute Company, a Washington Partnership
contact info
Defendant
William Joseph Miller, an individual
6113 176th Sreet East, Bldg. B
Puyallup, WA 98375
Represented By
William Joseph Miller
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth Alan Christin, an individual
5404 S. 364th Street
Auburn, WA 98001
Represented By
Kenneth Alan Christin
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust,
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Steven T. Gubner
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
34 34 notice Notice of Change of Address (Multi) Wed 01/12 10:25 AM
Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Firm Name . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/06 5:31 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3043. (rs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
33 33 order Default Judgment Thu 12/17 11:29 AM
Default Judgment Related [+] (bg)
Related: [-] 30
Friday, December 11, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Fri 12/11 12:03 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) In light of the court's willingness to grant Plaintiffs motion for default judgment, the December 17, 2020 scheduling conference is hereby VACATED. Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Dropped Fri 12/11 12:07 PM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] Off calendar per order on 12/11/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Monday, December 07, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Mon 12/07 6:51 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding is scheduled to come before the court on December 10, 2020 for a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for default judgment (Dkt. 30; the "Motion"). The Clerk has entered defaults as to all defendants, pursuant to FRCP 55(a) and FRBP 7055. The court has analyzed the Motion and all evidence introduced in support thereof and has concluded that Plaintiff has proven the elements of the causes of action pleaded in the complaint. Accordingly, the court orders as follows: (1) The Motion will be granted. (2) Within 10 days following entry of this Docket Text Order, Plaintiff's counsel shall submit (a) an order consistent with the Motion; and (b) a form of judgment. (3) The December 10 hearing on the Motion is hereby vacated. Related [+]. (Waites, Katie)
Related: [-] 30 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
court Hearing Dropped Mon 12/07 8:05 AM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] Off calendar per order on 12/7/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 30 Motion for Default Judgment filed by James Gansman
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/28 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendants, Declarations of Michael Hayes and Joseph Rothberg in support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendants; and Notice of Hearing of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendants Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 30 Motion for Default Judgment
31 31 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 10/28 2:30 PM
Notice of Hearing re Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Defendants Independent Chute Company, William Joseph Miller and Kenneth Alan Christin Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,30 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
30 30 motion Default Judgment Wed 10/28 2:27 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Hayes In Support of Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants
Att: 2 Declaration of Joseph Rothberg ISO Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendants
Thursday, October 22, 2020
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 10/22 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+]. Notice Date 10/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
28 28 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 10/20 11:08 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant William Joseph Miller . (jf)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
27 27 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 10/19 4:41 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant William Joseph Miller . (jf) See docket #28 for form - Clerk's Entry of Default. Modified on 10/20/2020 (jf). NOTE: The BNC Notice will not be generated. Modified on 10/20/2020 (rs)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 03, 2020
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sat 10/03 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+]. Notice Date 10/03/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thursday, October 01, 2020
25 25 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 10/01 4:45 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant William Joseph Miller Related [+]. (jf)
Related: [-] 10 Request For Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
24 24 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 10/01 4:42 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant William Joseph Miller Related [+]. (jf) Disregard - Clerk docketed with document attached. Modified on 10/1/2020 (jf)
Related: [-] 13 Request For Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
23 23 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 10/01 4:37 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Plaintiff James Gansman . (jf) Disregard, Clerk docketed in error. Modified on 10/1/2020 (jf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 09/30 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+]. Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Clerk's Entry of Default
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 09/30 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order and Notice in Request for Entry of Default.
Monday, September 28, 2020
20 20 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 09/28 3:41 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Kenneth Alan Christin Related [+]. (trw)
Related: [-] 16 Request For Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
19 19 order Defects in Request for Entry of Default Mon 09/28 3:39 PM
Order Re Notice of Defects in Request for Entry of Default. Related [+]. (trw)
Related: [-] 10 Request For Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Friday, September 25, 2020
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/25 4:33 PM
Certificate of Service re Request for Entry of Default against Kenneth Alan Christin and Declaration of Joseph Rothberg In Support Thereto Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 16 Request For Entry of Default,17 Declaration
17 17 misc Declaration Fri 09/25 4:30 PM
Declaration of Joseph Rothberg in in support of Request for Entry of Default Against Kenneth Alan Christin Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 16 Request For Entry of Default
16 16 misc Request For Entry of Default Fri 09/25 4:25 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Re: Against Defendant Kenneth Alan Christin Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Clerks Entry of Default due by 10/9/2020. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Service Executed
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/25 4:12 PM
Certificate of Service re Request for Entry of Default against William Joseph Miller aka W.J. Curley Miller and Declaration of Joseph Rothberg In Support Thereto Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 13 Request For Entry of Default,14 Declaration
14 14 misc Declaration Fri 09/25 4:10 PM
Declaration of Joseph Rothberg in in support of Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant William Joseph Miller aka W.J. Curley Miller Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 13 Request For Entry of Default
13 13 misc Request For Entry of Default Fri 09/25 4:08 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Re: against Defendant William Joseph Miller aka W.J. Curley Miller Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Clerks Entry of Default due by 10/9/2020. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Service Executed
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/25 3:46 PM
Certificate of Service re Request for Entry of Default against Independent Chute Company and Declaration of Joseph Rothberg In Support Thereto Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 10 Request For Entry of Default,11 Declaration
11 11 misc Declaration Fri 09/25 3:43 PM
Declaration of Joseph Rothberg in in support of of Request for Entry of Default Against Independent Chute Company Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 10 Request For Entry of Default
10 10 misc Request For Entry of Default Fri 09/25 3:41 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Re: against Defendant Independent Chute Company Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Clerks Entry of Default due by 10/9/2020. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Service Executed
Saturday, September 19, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Sat 09/19 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 09/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order
Friday, September 18, 2020
8 8 audio audio Fri 09/18 8:55 PM
The Audio File attached to the PDF includes several hearings. Court Date & Time [ 9/17/2020 2:00:00 PM ]. File Size [ 2260 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:25 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
7 7 3 pgs order Order Thu 09/17 3:12 PM
Order Following Scheduling Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 09/17 2:32 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Joseph Rothberg appeared for the Plaintiff. No other appearances were made. By 9/28/20, the Plaintiff shall request entry of clerk's default. Within 30 days from entry of clerk's default, Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for default judgment. The court will issue an order. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Friday, September 11, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/11 1:30 PM
Certificate of Service re Declaration of Jason B. Komorsky in support of Service of Summons & Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 5 Declaration
5 5 misc Declaration Fri 09/11 1:03 PM
Declaration of Jason B. Komorsky in in support of Service of Summons and Complaint of Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Service Executed
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Tue 09/08 11:11 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding is scheduled to come before the court on September 17, 2020 for a scheduling conference. The court has reviewed the complaint, summons (Dkt. 2), and certificate of service of process (Dkt. 4) and orders as follows:Deft. William Joseph Miller was served on July 6, 2020 by first class mail sent to 6113 176th Street East, Bldg. B, Puyallup, WA 98375. According to Para. 9 of Plaintiff's complaint, Mr. Miller is an individual who resides in the State of Washington. Ex. 1 to the complaint consists of a Sedgwick LLP engagement agreement dated July 25, 2017 and sent to Deft Miller and Deft. Independent Chute Company (ICC) at the same street address and zip code as that used for service of process, but in a different city: Frederickson, WA. Ex. 2 to the complaint consists of invoices issued by Sedgwick LLP to Mr. Miller and ICC between August 2017 January 2018 and sent to the same address as that used for service of process. The court notes that these invoices indicate that the engagement for which Sedgwick was retained involved defending Mr. Miller and ICC in an unlawful detainer action in which a writ of restitution was issued and in which a motion to vacate that writ was denied. Pursuant to FRBP 7004(b)(1), individuals can be served with process by first class mail sent to their place of residence or their typical place of business. Based on the courts review of the record, it cannot conclude that Mr. Miller has been properly served with process without additional information. Accordingly, the court ORDERS Plaintiff to file and serve no later than September 11, 2020, a declaration explaining why he believes that Deft. Miller has been validly serviced with process. This will permit the court to determine whether Mr. Miller was properly served prior to the September 17, 2020 scheduling conference.Deft. Kenneth Alan Christin was served on July 6, 2020 by first class mail sent to 5404 S. 364th Street, Auburn, WA 98001-9128. According to Para. 10 of Plaintiffs complaint, Mr. Christen is an individual who resides in the State of Washington. Pursuant to FRBP 7004(b)(1), individuals can be served with process by first class mail sent to their place of residence or their typical place of business. Based on the courts review of the record, it cannot conclude that Mr. Christen has been properly served with process without additional information. Accordingly, the court ORDERS Plaintiff to file and serve no later than September 11, 2020, a declaration explaining why he believes that Deft. Christen has been validly served. This will permit the court to determine whether Mr. Christen was properly served prior to the September 17, 2020 scheduling conference.Defendant ICC was served on July 6, 2020 by first class mail sent to 38125 2nd Ave. S, Roy, WA 98580. According to Para. 8 of the complaint, Deft. ICC is a WA partnership located at 6113 176th Street East, Bldg. B, Frederickson, WA 98375. FRBP 7004(b)(3) permits service of process by first class mail on domestic corporations if sent to the attention of an officer, a managing or general agent, or a statutory agent for service of process. If sent to a statutory agent for service of process, and if applicable law so requires, process must also be sent to the defendant. The address used for service of process on ICC differs from that set forth in the complaint and attached exhibits. The court notes that Ex. 2 to the complaint suggests that the address set forth Para. 8 of the complaint is no longer a valid address for Deft. ICC, but the certificate of service of the summons offers no indication as to how the address used for service of process was determined to be valid. It also does not appear that service sent to ICC was directed to the attention of an officer, managing or general agent, or statutory agent for service of process. The court cannot conclude that ICC has been properly served with process without additional information. Accordingly, on or before September 11, 2020, Plaintiff shall file and serve a declaration explaining why he believes service of process is valid as to Deft. ICC. This will permit the court to determine the validity of service of process prior to the September 17, 2020 scheduling conference. Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, July 06, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/06 3:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on Kenneth Alan Christin 7/6/2020; Independent Chute Company, a Washington Partnership 7/6/2020; William Joseph Miller 7/6/2020 . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Tue 06/30 4:05 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (aw)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 06/30 4:04 PM
Summons Issued on Kenneth Alan Christin Answer Due 7/30/2020; Independent Chute Company, a Washington Partnership Answer Due 7/30/2020; William Joseph Miller Answer Due 7/30/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 9/17/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (aw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/30 12:23 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03043 . 11 Related [+] Complaint by James Gansman against Independent Chute Company, a Washington Partnership, William Joseph Miller, Kenneth Alan Christin. Fee Amount $350. (Gubner, Steven)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet
crditcrd none Tue 06/30 1:53 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-03043 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 30609552, amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Complaint