Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03047
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2020
Terminated:Sep 10, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Paul Kubosh
1619 Lubbock Street
Houston, TX 77007
Represented By
Paul Kubosh
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Weber Seror LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Change of Address (Multi) Wed 01/12 10:25 AM
Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Firm Name . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/10 12:38 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3047. (myt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/09 9:32 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
6 6 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 09/09 9:30 AM
Stipulation to Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. Case Management Action due after 09/23/2020. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Tue 09/08 11:15 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding is set to come before the court on September 17, 2020 for a scheduling conference. The court has reviewed the complaint, summons (Dkt. 2), and certificate of service of process (Dkt. 5) and hereby finds and concludes that service of process as to Defendant Paul Kubosh is valid, pursuant to FRBP 7004(b)(1), as Plaintiff appears to have served Mr. Kubosh with process at his typical place of business, as evidenced by Exs. 1 and 2 to Plaintiffs complaint. Pursuant to FRBP 7012(a), Mr. Kubosh's initial responsive pleading was due on July 31, 2020, but none has been filed. Accordingly, the court ORDERS as follows: (1) The scheduling conference is hereby continued to January 21, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. (2) No later than September 25, 2020, Plaintiff shall request entry of default as to Deft. Kubosh, pursuant to FRCP 55(a)/FRBP 7055 (3) within 60 days following entry of default, Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment. Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Tue 09/08 11:15 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 9/8/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Monday, July 06, 2020
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/06 3:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Paul Kubosh 7/6/2020 . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 03, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/03 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/03/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Wed 07/01 9:59 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lm)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 07/01 9:57 AM
Summons Issued on Paul Kubosh Answer Due 7/31/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 9/17/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/30 4:23 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03047 . 11 Related [+] Complaint by James Gansman against Paul Kubosh. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet