Davis v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-81037 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Iowa Northern, 6:20-cv-02043 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 29, 2020 4:09 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Carl Davis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Tue 11/14 2:14 PM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas) |
|
Monday, August 09, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Striking
Mon 08/09 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Striking 19 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, by Carl Davis (Hamilton, Steven) |
|
Friday, August 06, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 08/06 5:26 PM
Notice of Appeal by Carl Davis. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14908484. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Hamilton, Steven) |
|
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Mon 08/09 9:18 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re18 Notice of Appeal. Document Filed in Incorrect Case ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document in the correct case 20-02924 Please file under USCA Appeal Document choose Corrected Appeal and text in the fee receipt number. (hh) |
||
Monday, June 21, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 06/21 4:35 PM
Second MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint-V2 (Dismissals Included) against All Defendants, filed by Carl Davis.(Hamilton, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, May 12, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Wed 05/12 9:12 AM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against Ajanta Pharma USA Inc., Novitium Pharma LLC, Sandoz Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Denton Pharma Inc. d/b/a Northwind Pharmaceuticals, filed by Carl Davis.(Hamilton, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal MDL Amended Complaint
Wed 11/04 11:12 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against All Defendants, MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carl Davis.(Hamilton, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s) Summons | ||
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Administrative Order
Wed 07/22 11:34 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Thu 07/02 3:59 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Iowa. Case Number 6:20-cv-02043 with documents 1-10. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81037-RLR on 7/2/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
12 | 12
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 07/02 2:44 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Thu 07/02 2:41 PM
Case transferred in from Iowa Northern; Case Number 6:20-cv-02043. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). |
|
10 | 10
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Thu 07/02 9:27 AM
CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-23) MDL No. 2924. This action is transferred to USDC Southern District of Florida and assigned to the Honorable Robin L Rosenberg. Signed by John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 7/01/2020 (Case electronically transferred to Western District of Missouri) (des) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC Notice of Finalization of Transfer Order (Haas, Frances) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A to Notice of Finalization of Transfer Order | ||
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER granting5 MOTION to Stay filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical Inc., Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and staying case: This case shall be stayed pending transfer to the MDL or, if objections to transfer are filed, pending the MDL's ruling on the transfer motion. If objections to transfer are filed, the parties should notify the court by filing a status report by July 15, 2020 . Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 6/26/2020. (kms) | |
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 TEXT ORDER granting6 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's removed petition (Doc. 3) is extended for all Defendants to 07/27/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 06/25/2020. (KEM) | |
6 | 6 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal,, Defendants' Unresisted Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Respond to Removed Petition by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical Inc., Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Haas, Frances) | |
5 | 5 UNRESISTED Motion for stay pending transfer to multidistrict litigation proceeding by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical Inc., Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Haas, Frances) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A to Motion | ||
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the New Removal Case Packet. (ksy) | |
3 | 3 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical Inc., Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (ksy) | |
Set Deadlines: Defendants LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/13/2020. (ksy) | ||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 7/22/2020. (ksy) | |
Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. (No conflicts identified) (ksy) | ||
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court Black Hawk County, case number LACV140362. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3227567), filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 8/18/2020 (Haas, Frances) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Original Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Return of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Return of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Supplement Local Rule 81(a) Statement |