WEDDING et al v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-81045 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:20-cv-07028 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 02, 2021 5:04 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
BARBARA WEDDING
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES WEDDING
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 08/12 12:28 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT - Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by JAMES WEDDING, BARBARA WEDDING.(Seeger, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Administrative Order
Wed 07/22 11:44 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 07/06 11:14 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:20-cv-07028 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81045-RLR on 7/6/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 07/06 11:09 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 07/06 11:05 AM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-07028. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-22) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI S.A., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) | |
Tuesday, June 09, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI S.A. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10920208) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JAMES WEDDING, BARBARA WEDDING.(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Valisure Citizen Petition on Ranitidine, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg) |