Giuliano v. Burke Veneers, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50683 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Burke Veneers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T Giuliano, in his capacity as chapter 7 trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 11/13 9:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50683 Closed (LCN) |
||
Saturday, October 31, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/31/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Default Judgment Against Defendant Burke Veneers, Inc. Signed on 10/29/2020. (LCN) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/08/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Burke Veneers, Inc. Signed on 10/6/2020. (LCN) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Entry of Default Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Burke Veneers, Inc.. Tickle due by: 9/8/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/07 2:06 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50683 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9862332, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50683 Complaint For Avoidance And Recovery Of Preferential Transfers Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 by Alfred T Giuliano against Burke Veneers, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/7/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |