Giuliano v. Ostyn-Newman, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50689 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ostyn-Newman, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T Giuliano, in his capacity as chapter 7 trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 07/30 9:56 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50689 Closed (SJS) |
||
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Ostyn-Newman, Inc.. Tickle due by: 9/8/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/07 2:06 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50689 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9862332, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50689 Complaint For Avoidance And Recovery Of Preferential Transfers Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 502(d), 547 & 550 and Objection to Claim No. 36 by Alfred T Giuliano against Ostyn-Newman, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/7/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |