Giuliano v. Aon Risk Services Central, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50695 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Aon Risk Services Central, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 27, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Keane, Peter) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 10/27 3:13 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50695 Closed (LCN) |
||
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 10/13/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 02, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 9/1/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Between Alfred T. Giuliano and Defendant Aon Risk Services Central, Inc. . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Fri 07/10 1:24 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50695 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9867636, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Aon Risk Services Central, Inc.. [Pretrial Conference Date To Be Determined] Tickle due by: 9/8/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50695 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 & 550 by Alfred T. Giuliano against Aon Risk Services Central, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |