Roseberry v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-81171 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Nebraska, 8:20-cv-00260 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2021 4:40 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Inc Pfizer
|
|
Plaintiff
Glenn A. Roseberry, NE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Wed 09/27 8:33 AM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 07/29 5:09 PM
Third MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Pfizer Inc., Catalytica Pharmaceutical, Inc., DSM Pharmaceutical, Inc., Patheon Manufacturing Services L L C, Walmart, Inc, GlaxoSmithKline filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Glenn A. Roseberry.(Williams, Christian) |
|
Friday, May 14, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 05/14 11:24 AM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants, filed by Glenn A. Roseberry.(Domina, David) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 03/01 2:17 PM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Chattem Inc., Inc Pfizer, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Glenn A. Roseberry.(Williams, Christian) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Mon 01/11 11:59 PM
Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Glenn A. Roseberry.(Williams, Christian) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Administrative Order
Wed 07/22 12:53 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, July 17, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Fri 07/17 11:39 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Nebraska. Case Number 8:20-cv-00260 with documents 1-15. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81171-RLR on 7/17/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
17 | 17
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 07/17 11:29 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
16 | 16
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Fri 07/17 11:25 AM
Case transferred in from Nebraska; Case Number 8:20-cv-00260. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
15 | 15 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924.(LAC) | |
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Email | ||
14 | 14 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (LAC) | |
Att: 1 Notice of Electronic Filing, | ||
Att: 2 Minutes | ||
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
13 | 13 ORDER granting12 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this action are hereby stayed pending its transfer to MDL 2924. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB) | |
12 | 12 MOTION to Stay (Agreed Motion to Stay) by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Huffer, Michael) | |
11 | 11 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Defendants' Amended Notice of Removal) against Glenn A. Roseberry from District Court of Sarpy County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-972 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Chattem, Inc.(Huffer, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Pleadings | ||
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 LETTER by Clerk regarding Notice of Removal1 with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LRM) | |
9 | 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) | |
8 | 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sanofi US Services Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) | |
7 | 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) | |
6 | 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew T. Bayman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) | |
5 | 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert B. Friedman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) | |
4 | 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Julia Zousmer has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) | |
3 | 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) | |
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Request for Location of Trial by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Huffer, Michael) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Sarpy County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-972 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4189143) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Huffer, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 |