Giuliano v. Level 3 Communications, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50713 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Level 3 Communications, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group LLC, et al.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 03/22 11:05 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50713 Closed (LCN) |
||
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending the Deadline forDefendant to Respond to the Complaint. Order Signed on 1/12/2021. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 12/4/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 11/12/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 10/13/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 09, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 9/14/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Between Alfred T. Giuliano and Defendant Level 3 Communications, LLC . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 07/20 1:16 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50713 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9879580, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Level 3 Communications, LLC. Tickle due by: 9/14/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50713 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to Sections 502(d), 547 & 550 and Objection to Claim No. 226 by Alfred T. Giuliano against Level 3 Communications, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |