Giuliano v. Yash Technologies, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50716 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Yash Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group LLC, et al.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago |
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 07/27 8:51 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50716 Closed (LCN) |
||
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Keane, Peter) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 07/20 1:16 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50716 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9879580, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Yash Technologies, Inc.. Tickle due by: 9/14/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50716 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to Sections 502(d), 547 & 550 and Objection to Claim No. 224 by Alfred T. Giuliano against Yash Technologies, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |