Lakeland Seller Finance, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11647
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11647
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | James L Garrity Jr |
Case #: | 1:20-bk-11649 |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | Over 100,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Lakeland Seller Finance, LLC
218 W Water St Ste 400
Charlottesville, VA 22902-5062 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago |
Tuesday, July 06, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 07/06 3:03 PM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Sunday, March 28, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order, Final Decree
Sun 03/28 7:09 PM
Order of Final Decree signed on 3/28/2021. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Thu 12/10 1:47 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated per Order Doc #63 in Case No 20-11647 (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney For Debtor (Rule 2016(b)) - Form 2030
Mon 12/07 12:29 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney For Debtor (Rule 2016(b))- Form 2030 Filed by Nicole Greenblatt on behalf of Lakeland Seller Finance, LLC. (Greenblatt, Nicole) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Thu 07/23 7:19 AM
Case Jointly Administered with 20-11647 (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Wed 07/22 6:15 PM
Order signed on 7/22/2020 in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Lakeland Tours, LLC, Case No. 20-11647 Brightspark Travel, Inc., Case No. 20 11648; Explorica Merida Holdings, LLC, Case No. 20 11650; Explorica Travel, Inc., Case No. 20-11651 Explorica, Inc., Case No. 20-11653 GlobaLinks - Canada, LLC, Case No. 20-11656 GlobaLinks, LLC, Case No. 20-11658 Heritage Education & Festivals, LLC, Case No. 20-11661 International Studies Abroad, LLC, Case No. 20-11663 ISA World Holding, LLC, Case No. 20-11666 Lakeland Finance, LLC, Case No. 20-11668 Lakeland Holdings, LLC, Case No. 20-11669 Lakeland Seller Finance, LLC, Case No. 20-11649 Leadership Platform Acquisition Corporation, Case No. 20-11652 National Educational Travel Council, LLC, Case No. 20-11654 Oxbridge Academic Resources, LLC, Case No. 20 11655; Travel Turf, Inc., Case No. 20-11657 WH Blocker, Inc., Case No. 20-11659 WorldStrides Holdings, LLC, Case No. 20-11660 WorldStrides International, LLC, Case No. 20 11662; WS Holdings Acquisition, Inc., Case No. 20-11664 WS Holdings, Inc., Case No. 20-11665 and WS Purchaser, Inc., Case No. 20-11667 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 20 11647. (Rodriguez, Willie) (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Tue 07/21 3:15 AM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Susan D. Golden on behalf of Lakeland Seller Finance, LLC. (Golden, Susan) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 07/21 1:52 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Susan D. Golden of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of Lakeland Seller Finance, LLC. (Golden, Susan) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 07/21 2:27 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 20-11649 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14154698. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Add Judge
Tue 07/21 8:22 AM
Judge James L. Garrity, Jr. added to the case. (Lewis, Tenille) |
||
misc
Set Deficiency Deadlines
Tue 07/21 9:11 AM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A/B due 8/4/2020. Schedule D due 8/4/2020. Schedule E/F due 8/4/2020. Schedule G due 8/4/2020. Schedule H due 8/4/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 8/4/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/4/2020. Atty Disclosure State. due 8/4/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 8/4/2020, (Lewis, Tenille) |