Giuliano v. Akzo Nobel Coatings Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50766 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Akzo Nobel Coatings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 01/20 10:45 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50766 Closed (LCN) |
||
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Notice of Dismissal [Voluntary] of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 12/14/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 11/12/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 10/13/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 09, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 9/14/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Between Alfred T. Giuliano and Defendant Akzo Nobel Coatings Inc. . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 07/20 1:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50766 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9880423, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Akzo Nobel Coatings Inc.. Tickle due by: 9/18/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50766 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 & 550 by Alfred T. Giuliano against Akzo Nobel Coatings Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |