Giuliano v. Shelba D. Johnson Trucking, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50767 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Shelba D. Johnson Trucking, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Stipulation of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/15 4:06 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50767 Closed (LCN) |
||
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Fallon, Brett) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 01/22/2021. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Brett Fallon is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 3/22/2021. Signed on 1/20/2021. (LCN) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Shelba D. Johnson Trucking, Inc. Mediation due date: 01/19/2021. (Casarino, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Between Alfred T. Giuliano and Defendant Shelba D. Johnson Trucking, Inc. . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 07/20 1:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50767 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9880423, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Shelba D. Johnson Trucking, Inc.. Tickle due by: 9/18/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50767 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 & 550 by Alfred T. Giuliano against Shelba D. Johnson Trucking, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |