Aguillard et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-81188 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Middle, 3:20-cv-00423 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 18, 2021 6:53 AM EST |
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Research & Development Company
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer
|
|
Defendant
Safeway Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sam's West, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Company PLC
|
|
Defendant
Duane Reade, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline (America), Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.,
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Company
|
|
Defendant
Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
L Perrigo Co.
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline LLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
999 Lake Drive
Issaquah, WA 98027 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de D.V.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Albertson's Companies, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Aguillard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Aguillard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 4:33 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Perrigo Research & Development Company served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
40 | 40
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 4:32 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. L Perrigo Co. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
39 | 39
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:34 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Glaxosmithkline LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
38 | 38
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:33 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Chattem Inc. served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
37 | 37
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:31 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
36 | 36
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:29 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Sanofi U.S. Services Inc. served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
35 | 35
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:28 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
34 | 34
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:27 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
33 | 33
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:25 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
32 | 32
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:10 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
31 | 31
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:08 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Walmart Inc served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
30 | 30
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:07 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
29 | 29
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:05 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Walgreen Co. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
28 | 28
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:04 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
27 | 27
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:02 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Sam's West, Inc served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
26 | 26
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:01 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Safeway Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
25 | 25
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 3:00 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Pfizer served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
24 | 24
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 2:59 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Perrigo Company served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
23 | 23
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 2:57 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 2:55 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. GlaxoSmithKline (America), Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 2:54 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Duane Reade, Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 2:52 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Costco Wholesale Corporation served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 2:49 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Albertson's Companies, Inc. served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 10/13 2:46 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,12 MDL Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/22 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Perrigo Research & Development Company. (mc) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/22 4:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC. (mc) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Tue 09/22 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/22 3:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Albertson's Companies, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Duane Reade, Inc., GLAXOSMITHKLINE (AMERICA) INC, L Perrigo Co., Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC, Perrigo Company, Pfizer, Safeway Inc., Sam's West, Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc, Watson Laboratories, Inc..(lbc) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 6 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 7 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 8 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 9 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 10 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 11 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 12 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 13 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 14 Summon(s) | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Tue 09/22 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard (Kolb, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Proposed Summons | ||
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Wed 09/16 1:16 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard.(Kolb, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Administrative Order
Wed 07/29 4:21 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Thu 07/23 9:26 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Middle District of Louisiana. Case Number 3:20-cv-00423 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81188-RLR on 7/22/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 07/22 2:42 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 07/22 2:33 PM
Case transferred in from Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00423. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
7 | 7
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 07/22 8:41 AM
Order Transferring Case to JPML Court.(SWE) |
|
Att: 1 Certified CTO | ||
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (SWE) | |
Att: 1 Minute Order | ||
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER granting2 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Complaint to Correct Deficiency filed by Clayton Aguillard, Christine Aguillard. The Clerk of Court shall substitute R. Doc. 2-1 in the place of R. Doc. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) | |
4 | 4 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KMW) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard re1 Complaint (Kolb, Andrew) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/2/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW). | |
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Complaint to Correct Deficiency by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard.(Kolb, Andrew) Modified on 7/2/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). | |
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2135919.), filed by Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard.(Kolb, Andrew) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/6/2020) (ELW). Modified on 7/6/2020 as ordered by rec doc 5 (ELW). | |
MOTION(S) REFERRED:2 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Complaint to Correct Deficiency . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) |