New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:20-cr-00623
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2020
Last checked: Friday Jul 24, 2020 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
STEVEN NEWKIRK (1)
Represented By
RUTH M. LIEBESMAN
contact info
K. ANTHONY THOMAS
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
KENDALL RENEE RANDOLPH
U.S. Attorney'S Office - District Of Nj
contact info

GPO Jul 23 2024
OPINION as to STEVEN NEWKIRK. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 7/23/2024. (JB)

Docket last updated: 09/20/2023 3:03 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
1 1 3 pgs COMPLAINT as to STEVEN NEWKIRK (1). (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs SEALING ORDER as to STEVEN NEWKIRK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/24/2019. (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to STEVEN NEWKIRK for 4/29/2019 (seb) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus as to STEVEN NEWKIRK. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/26/2019. (seb) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
Arrest of STEVEN NEWKIRK (seb) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark:Initial Appearance, Attorney Appointment Hearing, Bond Hearing as to STEVEN NEWKIRK held on 4/29/2019. Defendant advised of rights. Financial affidavit reviewed and executed. AFPD appointed. Bail set $100,000 (unsecured). (Court Reporter/Recorder ecr.) (seb) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to STEVEN NEWKIRK K. ANTHONY THOMAS for STEVEN NEWKIRK appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/29/2019. (seb) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by STEVEN NEWKIRK executed on the record. (seb) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to STEVEN NEWKIRK (1) $100,000.00 (unsecured). Travel restricted to NJ, PTS, etc. (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/29/2019. (seb) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs Appearance Bond Entered as to STEVEN NEWKIRK in amount of $ $100,000.00 (unsecured). (seb) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
11 11 1 pgs ORDER OF RELEASE as to STEVEN NEWKIRK. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/30/2019. (seb) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
12 12 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to STEVEN NEWKIRK Time excluded from 5/3/2019 until 7/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/6/2019. (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE HEATHER SUCHORSKY appearing for USA. (SUCHORSKY, HEATHER) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to STEVEN NEWKIRK Time excluded from 7/1/2019 until 8/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/1/2019. (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion:Attorney Appointment Hearing as to STEVEN NEWKIRK held on 8/9/2019, defendant whishes to change counsel from AFPD K. Anthony Thomas to CJA counsel. Application Granted, K. Anthony Thomas relieved as counsel, and Ruth Liebesman, Eq. CJA substituted in (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (spc, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
16 16 CJA 20 ORDER appointing Ruth Liebesman, Esq. as counsel for STEVEN NEWKIRK; K. Anthony Thomas terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 8/9/2019. (spc, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
17 17 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to STEVEN NEWKIRK Time excluded from 9/3/2019 until 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/9/2019. (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
18 18 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by STEVEN NEWKIRK.(LIEBESMAN, RUTH) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 28, 2019
19 19 1 pgs ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release as to STEVEN NEWKIRK (1) $100,000 (unsecured) (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/28/2019. (seb) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
20 20 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to STEVEN NEWKIRK Time excluded from 10/31/2019 until 12/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/31/2019. (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2019
21 21 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to STEVEN NEWKIRK Time excluded from 12/19/2019 until 2/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/23/2019. (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
22 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE KENDALL RENEE RANDOLPH appearing for USA. (RANDOLPH, KENDALL) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
23 23 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to STEVEN NEWKIRK Time excluded from 2/28/2020 until 4/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/28/2020. (sms) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
24 24 1 pgs Letter from Ruth Liebesman (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
25 25 Order Modifying Conditions of Release as to STEVEN NEWKIRK - Travel permitted to viewing and funeral only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/5/2020. (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
26 26 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to STEVEN NEWKIRK Time excluded from 3/16/2020 until 4/30/2020. Per Standing Order 20-02. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/16/2020. (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
27 27 STANDING ORDER 20-3 (CORVID 19) excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from March 16, 2020 through April 30, 2020 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/16/2020. (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
28 28 STANDING ORDER 20-9 (COVID 19) excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from March 16, 2020 through May 31, 2020 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/17/2020. [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
29 29 STANDING ORDER 20-12 (COVID 19) excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from May 22, 2020 through August 31, 2020 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/22/2020. (jqb, ) [2:19-mj-04238-MAH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
Notice of Allocation and Assignment as to STEVEN NEWKIRK [Newark - Judge Brian R. Martinotti] (msd)
Related: [-]
30 30 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to STEVEN NEWKIRK (1) count 1. (msd)
Related: [-]