Thomas et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-81215 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 25, 2021 6:12 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chattem, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Servces Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Juanita Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
order
Administrative Order
Wed 07/29 4:21 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
3 | 3
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 07/29 3:56 PM
MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:20-cv-81215-RLR with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 07/29 9:11 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/29 8:52 AM
COMPLAINT -Short Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13259650, filed by Juanita Thomas, Willie Thomas.(Seeger, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 07/29 3:52 PM
Cases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) |