Giuliano v. Wayne Industries, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50771 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 28, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Wayne Industries, Inc.
4107 Cheyenne Drive
Archdale, NC 27263 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC et al.,
2301 E. Evesham Road Pavillion 800, Suite 210
Voorhees, NJ 08043 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 02/23 10:19 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50771 Closed (LCN) |
||
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Tancredi, Damien) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Wayne Industries, Inc.. (Noble, J.) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Fourth Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond Order Signed on 1/29/2021. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Fourth Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond Filed by Wayne Industries, Inc.. (Noble, J.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order Approving Third Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond Order Signed on 12/4/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Third Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond Filed by Wayne Industries, Inc.. (Noble, J.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Wayne Industries, Inc.. (Noble, J.) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Order Approving Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond Order Signed on 11/5/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond Filed by Wayne Industries, Inc.. (Noble, J.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond Between Wayne Industries, Inc. and Alfred T. Giuliano, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al. . Filed by Wayne Industries, Inc.. (Ramos, Marcos) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Tancredi, Damien) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Wayne Industries, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 11/9/2020. (Tancredi, Damien) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/28 3:33 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50771 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (VIB) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50771 Complaint by Ch. 7 Trustee for Heritage Home Group, LLC et al by Alfred T. Giuliano against Wayne Industries, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 10/26/2020. (Tancredi, Damien) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |